Boater's Emergency Service, LLC v. Archon Hat 80, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Boater's Emergency Service, LLC
Defendant: Archton Hat 80, LLC, Joseph B. Sebring, ACE American Insurance Company, Archon Hat 80, LLC, The Keenan Agency and Rick Bersnak
Case Number: 3:2021cv02047
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Brenna L. Fasko filed by on behalf of Archon Hat 80, LLC, Joseph B. Sebring. (Fasko, Brenna)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Archon Hat 80, LLC. (Burger, Robert)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 Praecipe for issuance of Third Party Summons filed by Archon Hat 80, LLC, Joseph B. Sebring. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 Summons on The Keenan Agency, #2 Summons on Rick Bersnak)(Burger, Robert)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Third party complaint against The Keenan Agency, Rick Bersnak, Crossclaim against ACE American Insurance Company filed by Joseph B. Sebring, Archon Hat 80, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Denial)(Burger, Robert)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 11/29/21. Court discussed initial handling for this litigation. A further Phone Status will be held on 2/2/22 at 9:30 AM. Counsel should use the same District Court conference line. In the interim, counsel should begin their Rule 26(a) disclosures. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/30/21. (S,Na)
November 22, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 11/29/21 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Boater's Emergency Service, LLC. Archton Hat 80, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 filed on behalf of Boater's Emergency Service, LLC (Murray, Dennis)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Boater's Emergency Service, LLC. Joseph B. Sebring waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 filed on behalf of Boater's Emergency Service, LLC (Murray, Dennis)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Markus E. Apelis and Zoran A. Balac filed by on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company. (Apelis, Markus)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Boater's Emergency Service, LLC. ACE American Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 filed on behalf of Boater's Emergency Service, LLC (Murray, Dennis)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/28/21. (K,AR)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons provided none were issued. (K,AR)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number BOHNDC-11107082.. Filed by BOATERS EMERGENCY SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Contract, #2 Exhibit B-Invoice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Murray, Dennis)
October 28, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
October 28, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR)
October 28, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boater's Emergency Service, LLC v. Archon Hat 80, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boater's Emergency Service, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Galea
Represented By: Dennis E. Murray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archton Hat 80, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Sebring
Represented By: Brenna L. Fasko
Represented By: Robert W. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Markus E. Apelis
Represented By: Zoran A. Balac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archon Hat 80, LLC
Represented By: Brenna L. Fasko
Represented By: Robert W. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Keenan Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Bersnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?