AGCS Marine Insurance Company v. Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V. et al
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V. and PVE Equipment USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02092
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. Initial Phone Status held on 11/23/21. Counsel shall meet and confer regarding potential amendments to the Complaint. Defendants' Answer to the Complaint is stayed until further Order of this Court. A Case Management Conference (CMC) is scheduled for 1/19/22 at 10:00 AM (EST). Counsel may participate by phone, and party attendance is not required. Counsel shall use the same District Court conference line. Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged no later than two weeks prior to the CMC. A Report of Parties' Planning Meeting shall be jointly signed and filed at least three (3) days before the CMC. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/23/21. (S,Na)
November 17, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 11/23/21 at 11:30 AM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order granting #4 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Brendan K. Birmingham for PVE Equipment USA, Inc. & Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting #3 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael F. Nerone for PVE Equipment USA, Inc. & Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/9/2021. (K,AR)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (K,AR)
November 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
November 9, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Brendan K. Birmingham to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing attached. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11120048, filed by PVE Equipment USA, Inc., Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hettrich, Jordan) Modified on 11/5/2021 (W,Jo).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Michael F. Nerone to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing attached. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11120025, filed by PVE Equipment USA, Inc., Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hettrich, Jordan) Modified on 11/5/2021 (W,Jo).
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by PVE Equipment USA, Inc., Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V.. Related document(s) #1 . (Hettrich, Jordan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas of Lucas County, Ohio, case number G-4801-CI-0202103150-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11119282.. Filed by PVE Equipment USA, Inc., Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V.. (Hettrich, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGCS Marine Insurance Company v. Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan B. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woltman Piling & Drilling Rigs B.V.
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Represented By: Brendan K. Birmingham
Represented By: Michael F. Nerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVE Equipment USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Represented By: Brendan K. Birmingham
Represented By: Michael F. Nerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?