Fackler et al v. Harland L. Fackler Trust et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Fackler and Julie Crawford
Defendant: Harland L. Fackler Trust, Nina M. Fackler Trust, Mary Fackler Revocable Trust of 2004 and Mary L. Schiavo
Case Number: 3:2022cv00565
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Referring Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Fritz Byers filed by on behalf of Mary Fackler Revocable Trust of 2004, Nina M. Fackler Trust, Mary L. Schiavo. (Byers, Fritz)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/19/2022. (V,S)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Robert Charles Tucker filed by on behalf of Mary Fackler Revocable Trust of 2004, Nina M. Fackler Trust, Mary L. Schiavo. (Tucker, Robert)
May 19, 2022 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (K,AR)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/12/2022. (S,DM)
April 12, 2022 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (S,DM)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Harland L. Fackler Trust, Mary Fackler Revocable Trust of 2004, Nina M. Fackler Trust and Mary L. Schiavo. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,DM)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Mary Fackler Revocable Trust of 2004, Mary L. Schiavo, The Harland Fackler Trust, The Nina M. Fackler Trust. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11363518.. Filed by Tamara Fackler, Julie Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Legal Descriptions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Harland Fackler Trust, #3 Exhibit 3 - Fiduciary Deed, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Davis, R.)
April 8, 2022 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (S,DM)
April 8, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fackler et al v. Harland L. Fackler Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Fackler
Represented By: Joseph R. Torda
Represented By: R. Ethan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Crawford
Represented By: Joseph R. Torda
Represented By: R. Ethan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harland L. Fackler Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina M. Fackler Trust
Represented By: Fritz Byers
Represented By: Robert Charles Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Fackler Revocable Trust of 2004
Represented By: Fritz Byers
Represented By: Robert Charles Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L. Schiavo
Represented By: Fritz Byers
Represented By: Robert Charles Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?