Ohio Civil Rights Commission v. TG Toledo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Civil Rights Commission
Defendant: TG Toledo, LLC, TG Toledo, LLC A Michigan Limited Liability Company, The Tobin Group, LLC, Group Five Management Company, TG Toledo LLC A Michigan Limited Liability Company and Tobin Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00608
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 Reply in support of #10 Motion to remand to State Court Lucas County Court of Common Pleas filed by Ohio Civil Rights Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Adrian Feiertag, with Attachment A, Minutes of the Regular Meeting of the Ohio Civil Rights Commission of February 24, 2022)(Feiertag, Adrian)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #10 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Tobin Declaration) (Bernard, Aretta)
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 Motion to remand to State Court Lucas County Court of Common Pleas filed by Plaintiff Ohio Civil Rights Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Adrian Feiertag plus Attachment A, email between opposing counsel)(Feiertag, Adrian)
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 Supplement to Answer to Complaint, - Exhibit G - Technical Policy, filed by Group Five Management Company, TG Toledo LLC A Michigan Limited Liability Company, TG Toledo, LLC, The Tobin Group, LLC. Related document(s) #8 . (Bernard, Aretta)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Group Five Management Company, TG Toledo LLC A Michigan Limited Liability Company, TG Toledo, LLC, The Tobin Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Housing Discrimination Charge, #2 Exhibit Letter from Group Five Management Company, #3 Exhibit Corrected Letter from Ohio Civil Rights Commission, #4 Exhibit Letter to Ohio Civil Rights Commission from Roetzel, #5 Exhibit WellCare Physician Group Letter, #6 Exhibit Pet Agreement)(Bernard, Aretta)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 Entry of Appearance and Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel removing attorney Sharon D. Tassie and adding attorney Adrian C. Feiertag filed by on behalf of Ohio Civil Rights Commission. (Feiertag, Adrian)
April 19, 2022 FILING ERROR - Notice to Attorney Stephanie O. Mittica. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) Modified to note attorney admitted Bar 0095651 as Stephanie Olivera Mittica on 4/19/2022 (O,K).
April 19, 2022 Notice to Attorney Sharon D. Tassie. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants TG Toledo, LLC, TG Toledo a Michigan Limited Liability Company, The Tobin Group, LLC, and Group Five Management Company Answers DUE 5/13/2022. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/18/2022. (B,JL)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (H,JL)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until May 13, 2022. to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Group Five Management Company, TG Toledo a Michigan Limited Liability Company, TG Toledo, LLC, The Tobin Group, LLC. (Bernard, Aretta)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Group Five Management Company. (Bernard, Aretta)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Tobin Group, LLC. (Bernard, Aretta)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by TG Toledo, LLC. (Bernard, Aretta)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-0202201791-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11374752.. Filed by The Tobin Group, LLC, TG Toledo a Michigan Limited Liability Company, TG Toledo, LLC, Group Five Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Ohio Secretary of State Certificate - TG Toledo, LLC, #3 Exhibit C - Ohio Secretary of State Certificate - The Tobin Group, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Ohio Secretary of State Certificate - Group Five Management Company, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to State Court Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bernard, Aretta)
April 15, 2022 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (H,JL)
April 15, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Civil Rights Commission v. TG Toledo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Civil Rights Commission
Represented By: Adrian C. Feiertag
Represented By: Sharon D. Tassie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TG Toledo, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TG Toledo, LLC A Michigan Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Stephanie Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tobin Group, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Five Management Company
Represented By: Stephanie Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TG Toledo LLC A Michigan Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Stephanie Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobin Group, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?