Farson v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Farson
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc., Cooper Companies, Inc., Femcare, Ltd and Utah Medical Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00716
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jessica Farson. (Purnell, Simon)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #13 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Simon B. Purnell for Jessica Farson. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/6/2022. (B,JL)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #12 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Daniel R. Griffin for Jessica Farson. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/6/2022. (B,JL)
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Simon B. Purnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11406707, filed by Plaintiff Jessica Farson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Henry, Eric)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11406674, filed by Plaintiff Jessica Farson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Henry, Eric)
May 4, 2022 Notice to Attorney Daniel R. Griffin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
May 4, 2022 Notice to Attorney Simon B. Purnell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,DM)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:22-cv-01877. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Change Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio, Western Division at Toledo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/3/22. (sem) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Notice by Clerk Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Coopersurgical, Inc., Cooper Companies, Inc., and Utah Medical Products Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement (S,DM)
May 3, 2022 Copy of #11 Magistrate Consent Form and Docket Sheet mailed to attorneys Daniel R. Griffin, Griffin Purnell, LLC at 8555 W. Forest Home Ave., Suite 205, Greenfield, WI 53228 and Simon Brian Purnell, Griffin Purnell, LLC at 615 N. Upper Broadway, Suite 900, Corpus Christi, TX 78401 on 5/3/2022. Related document(s) #11 . (S,DM)
May 3, 2022 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (S,DM)
May 3, 2022 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio (Western Division at Toledo).Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sem) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue as to Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Jessica Farson. (Purnell, Simon) Modified on 5/3/2022 to correct text and filing event (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice of Simon B Purnell & Daniel R Griffin as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/28/2022. (vb) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8840456) of Daniel R. Griffin by Plaintiff Jessica Farson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Henry, Eric) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 05500Q) of Simon B. Purnell by Plaintiff Jessica Farson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Henry, Eric) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CooperSurgical Inc., Femcare Ltd. - UK Subsidiary of Utah Medical Products Inc., The Cooper Companies Inc., and Utah Medical Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Femcare Ltd, #2 Summons Form The Cooper Companies, #3 Summons Form Utah Medical Products Inc) (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jessica Farson. Civil Cover Sheet. (Henry, Eric) Modified on 4/6/2022 to add document link (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #1 Complaint filed by Jessica Farson, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #1 Complaint as a text searchable document(s), using the "Amended Document" filing event, linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/6/2022. (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8806593), filed by Jessica Farson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form CooperSurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Form Femcare, Ltd., #4 Summons Form The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Form Utah Medical Products, Inc.) (Henry, Eric) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/3/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farson v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Farson
Represented By: Eric W. Henry
Represented By: Daniel R Griffin
Represented By: Simon Brian Purnell
Represented By: Daniel R. Griffin
Represented By: Simon B. Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Femcare, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Medical Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?