Foos v. US Utility Contractor Company
Plaintiff: William Foos
Defendant: US Utility Contractor Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00824
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by US Utility Contractor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3-29-21 Email)(Hudson, David)
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon US Utility Contractor Company c/o Stanley R. Chlebowski. Service attempted by Certified Mail on 6/22/22 filed on behalf of William Foos. (K,AR)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until July 14, 2022 to answer filed by Defendant US Utility Contractor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudson, David)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant US Utility Contractor Company Answer DUE 7/14/2022. Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/14/2022. (B,JL)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon US Utility Contractor Company on 6/6/2022, no delivery date on green card and green card unsigned, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website which noted it was left with individual, filed on behalf of William Foos. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (S,DM)
May 31, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to US Utility Contractor Company c/o Stanley R. Chlebowski placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7021 0350 0001 7231 7627. (R,EM)
May 31, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to US Utility Contractor Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7021 0350 0001 7231 7610. (R,EM)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon US Utility Contractor Company and US Utility Contractor Company c/o Stanley R. Chlebowski. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (K,AR)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against US Utility Contractor Company. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11429513.. Filed by William Foos. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Dubow, Daniel)
May 19, 2022 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR)
May 19, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
May 19, 2022 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foos v. US Utility Contractor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Foos
Represented By: Kevin A. Buryanek
Represented By: Shashelia Degraffinried
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Utility Contractor Company
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?