Miranda v. Exel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donna Miranda
Defendant: Exel, Inc. doing business as DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Case Number: 3:2022cv01897
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for January 10, 2023 at 9:30 AM. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Exel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment at-will and Arbitration Agreement)(Seaman, Todd)
November 3, 2022 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Anthony C. White filed by on behalf of Exel, Inc.. (White, Anthony)
November 3, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Exel Inc., D.B.A. DHL Supply Chain for Exel, Inc. filed by Exel, Inc.. (Seaman, Todd)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 Agreed Motion to extend deadline to move or plead until 12/15/2022. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1Proposed Order)(Seaman, Todd)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] granting #5 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Move or Plead. Defendant's Answer now due December 15, 2022. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/3/2022. (V,S)
November 1, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service executed upon Exel, Inc. on 10/24/2022, filed on behalf of Donna Miranda Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Kramer, Ellen)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/25/2022. (H,JL)
October 25, 2022 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (H,JL)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Exel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,JL)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Exel, Inc. d/b/a DHL Supply Chain (USA). Filing fee paid $402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11674702. Filed by Donna Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons SUMMONS) (Kramer, Ellen)
October 21, 2022 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case (H,JL)
October 21, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. Exel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Miranda
Represented By: Jason R. Bristol
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exel, Inc. doing business as DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Represented By: Anthony C. White
Represented By: Todd M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?