Mofield v. AP-Alternatives, LLC
Plaintiff: Zackery Mofield
Defendant: AP-Alternatives, LLC doing business as APA Solar Racking
Case Number: 3:2022cv01942
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Initial Telephone Conference held on December 20, 2022. Counsel shall begin their Rule 26(a) disclosures and continue their discussions. A brief Joint Status Report is due by February 8, 2023. All legal filings are stayed, including an Answer to the Complaint, until further Order of this Court. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/21/2022. (15 mins) (V,S)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Robert W. Bohmer filed by on behalf of AP-Alternatives, LLC. (Bohmer, Robert)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by James B. Yates filed by on behalf of AP-Alternatives, LLC. (Yates, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Sarah E. Pawlicki filed by on behalf of AP-Alternatives, LLC. (Pawlicki, Sarah)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel of record and substitution of counsel filed by Defendant AP-Alternatives, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Katherine)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] granting #5 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Katherine S. Decker removed from case. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/13/2022. (V,S)
December 13, 2022 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, December 20, 2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Zackery Mofield. AP-Alternatives, LLC waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022 filed on behalf of Zackery Mofield (Bailey, Jamie)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Katherine Stone Decker filed by on behalf of AP-Alternatives, LLC. (Decker, Katherine)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/1/22. (R,EM)
November 1, 2022 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (R,EM)
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against AP-Alternatives, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11687089. Filed by Zackery Mofield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Jamie)
October 28, 2022 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,EM)
October 28, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mofield v. AP-Alternatives, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackery Mofield
Represented By: Peter G. Friedmann
Represented By: Rachel Sabo Friedmann
Represented By: Jamie R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP-Alternatives, LLC doing business as APA Solar Racking
Represented By: Robert W. Bohmer
Represented By: Sarah E. Pawlicki
Represented By: James B. Yates
Represented By: Katherine Stone Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?