Zetzer v. Crown Battery Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Tiffany Zetzer
Defendant: Crown Battery Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv02329
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Initial Telephone Conference held on February 21, 2023. Plaintiff wishes to file a Motion for Conditional Certification. Defendant wishes to file a Motion for Stay. Counsel shall jointly provide this Court (zouhary_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov) a list of cases which discuss a stay pending the Holder decision. This Court will address class certification after it rules on the request for stay. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/22/2023. (30 mins) (V,S)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Crown Battery Manufacturing Company. (Yates, James)
February 13, 2023 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, February 21, 2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer now due February 13, 2023. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/24/2023. (V,S)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crown Battery Manufacturing Company. (Pawlicki, Sarah)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 13, 2023 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Crown Battery Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yates, James)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/13/2023. (K,AR)
January 13, 2023 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Crown Battery Manufacturing Company on 1/3/2023, filed on behalf of Tiffany Zetzer (Baishnab, Robi)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Crown Battery Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (K,AR)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 Collective and Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Crown Battery Manufacturing Company. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11769696.. Filed by Tiffany Zetzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Baishnab, Robi)
December 28, 2022 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
December 28, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zetzer v. Crown Battery Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Zetzer
Represented By: Robi J. Baishnab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Battery Manufacturing Company
Represented By: James B. Yates
Represented By: Sarah E. Pawlicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?