Wilcox v. UMH Properties, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wilcox
Defendant: UMH Properties, Inc. and Shawn Hopkins
Case Number: 3:2023cv01516
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by All Defendants. (Schnee, Douglas)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 10/12/2023 to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. re #8 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/21/2023.(M,SM)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 Second Motion for extension of time until October 12, 2023 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Shawn Hopkins, UMH Properties, Inc.. Related document(s) #4 . (Schnee, Douglas)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent UMH Properties, Inc. for UMH Properties, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Schnee, Douglas)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time until 9/21/2023 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. re #6 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/31/2023.(M,SM)
August 30, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 21, 2023 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Shawn Hopkins, UMH Properties, Inc.. Related document(s) #4 . (Schnee, Douglas)
August 17, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon UMH Properties, Inc. on 8/14/2023, filed on behalf of Cynthia Wilcox Related document(s) #2 . (H,JL)
August 14, 2023 Filing 4 First Amended #1 complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Cynthia Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Right To Sue Letter) (Wido, Christopher)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Shawn Hopkins on 8/12/2023; UMH Properties, Inc., c/o Corporation Service Company on 8/10/2023, filed on behalf of Cynthia Wilcox Related document(s) #2 . (H,JL)
August 7, 2023 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to UMH Properties, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0856 4146 83. (R,EM)
August 7, 2023 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to UMH Properties, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0856 4146 76. (R,EM)
August 7, 2023 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Shawn Hopkins placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0856 4146 90. (R,EM)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Shawn Hopkins, UMH Properties, Inc., and UMH Properties, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,EM)
August 4, 2023 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (R,EM)
August 4, 2023 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,EM)
August 4, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages with jury demand. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12117661. Filed by Cynthia Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Wido, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. UMH Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wilcox
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMH Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas B. Schnee
Represented By: Jacob S. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Hopkins
Represented By: Douglas B. Schnee
Represented By: Jacob S. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?