Miranda v. Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nikki Miranda
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01553
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.. (Bolduc, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.. (Yates, James)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Nikki Miranda. Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2023, answer due 10/8/2023 filed on behalf of Nikki Miranda (Riek, F.)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,DM)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12124004. Filed by Nikki Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Riek, F.)
August 9, 2023 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,DM)
August 9, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
August 9, 2023 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Miranda
Represented By: F. Benjamin Riek, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Northwest Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Bolduc
Represented By: James B. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?