Harrington v. Mallett
Plaintiff: Michael E. Harrington
Defendant: Michael H. Mallett
Counter-Defendant: Michael E. Harrington and Kirk Warehouse, LLC
Counter-Claimant: Michael H. Mallett
Case Number: 3:2024cv01453
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2024 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint and Counterclaim against Michael E. Harrington and Kirk Warehouse, LLC filed by Michael H. Mallett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Review of Affairs by Fruth and Company, #4 Exhibit Communications, #5 Exhibit Receipt)(Lefevre, Jared) Modified on 10/10/2024 (R,EM).
October 9, 2024 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, October 29, 2024 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Conference. (V,S)
October 2, 2024 Filing 5 Service by Clerk. Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Consent Form addressed to Michael H. Mallett placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (H,JL)
October 2, 2024 Filing 4 Request to Clerk for service upon Michael E. Harrington by ordinary mail. filed by Michael E. Harrington. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of mailing)(McHugh, John)
August 28, 2024 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/28/2024. (S,DM)
August 28, 2024 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (S,DM)
August 26, 2024 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Michael H. Mallett. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,DM)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint against Michael H. Mallett. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12708450. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be refiled to terminated civil action 3:21-cv-01608. Filed by Michael E. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kirk Warehouse, LLC Operating Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (McHugh, John)
August 26, 2024 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (S,DM)
August 26, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Harrington
Represented By: John J. McHugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Mallett
Represented By: Jared J. Lefevre
Represented By: Claire M. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Michael E. Harrington
Represented By: John J. McHugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Kirk Warehouse, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Michael H. Mallett
Represented By: Jared J. Lefevre
Represented By: Claire M. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?