Jones v. Vital & FNR Northa America, LLC
Plaintiff: Raybin I. Jones
Defendant: Vital & FNR Northa America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01612
Filed: September 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Financial Transaction in the amount of 405.00 received from Raybin Jones. Receipt # 14656 Related document(s) #4 . (K,AR)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the filing fee of $405 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is also notified that he will be responsible for service of process upon payment of the filing fee. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action without additional notice. re #2 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/4/2024. (M,SM)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Raybin I. Jones at 727 Amelia Street Toledo, OH 43607 on 10/4/2024. Related document(s) #4 . (M,SM)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint - Police Reports filed by Raybin I. Jones. Related document(s) #1 . (H,JL)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Raybin I. Jones. Related document(s) #1 . (S,DM)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint against Vital & FNR Northa America, LLC. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Raybin I. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Emails, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (S,DM)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,DM)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Vital & FNR Northa America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raybin I. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital & FNR Northa America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?