Keegan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jamie Keegan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2024cv01662
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong for further proceedings. Judge James R. Knepp II on 11/22/2024. (B,JL)
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge James R. Knepp II terminated. Related document(s) #8 . (S,DM)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Murphy, Kevin)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Bryan Konoski. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 10/4/2024. (B,JL)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for attorney Bryan Konoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support and Exhibit A - State Court Admissions . Filing fee $ 120.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12763747, filed by Plaintiff Jamie Keegan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Konoski, Bryan) Modified text on 10/1/2024 (B,DL).
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 9/27/2024. (K,L)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/2024. (H,JL)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Disclosures filed by Jamie Keegan. (Konoski, Bryan)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jamie Keegan. (Konoski, Bryan)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Jamie Keegan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Konoski, Bryan)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case (H,JL)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (H,JL)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (H,JL)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/27/2024. (H,JL)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 9/27/2024.(K,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keegan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Represented By: Kevin Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Keegan
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?