Google, Inc. v. EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Defendant: EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv01243
Filed: May 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Mahoning
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Economus
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2010 Filing 10 Order: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is granted and this case is dismissed (Related document 7 ). Judge Peter C. Economus on 1/4/10. (BR,S)
September 16, 2009 Filing 9 Reply to response to 7 Motion to dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Gaum, R.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 8 Opposition to 7 Motion to dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Final Identification of Claims and Products, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Chart for GMM)(Shunk, Thomas)
July 31, 2009 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Gaum, R.)
June 4, 2009 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Google, Inc.. Location Based Services LLC waiver sent on 6/1/2009, answer due 7/31/2009. filed on behalf of Google, Inc. (Moser, Christina)
June 4, 2009 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Google, Inc.. EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC waiver sent on 6/1/2009, answer due 7/31/2009. filed on behalf of Google, Inc. (Moser, Christina)
May 29, 2009 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,LA)
May 29, 2009 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,LA)
May 29, 2009 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Benita Y. Pearson. (H,LA)
May 29, 2009 Judge Peter C. Economus assigned to case. (H,LA)
May 29, 2009 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Moser, Christina)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 06470000000003580666, filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to EMSAT, # 3 Summons to LBS) (Moser, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google, Inc. v. EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Location Based Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?