United States of America v. Trumbull Metropolitan Housing Authority
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Trumbull Metropolitan Housing Authority, Russell Osman and Valerie Simeon
Case Number: 4:2017cv00101
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Benita Y. Pearson
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' Supplemental Brief to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 68 -1) is granted. The case is closed. A separate judgment entry will issue. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/17/2018. (JLG)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 64 ) is denied as unnecessary. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/11/2018. (JLG)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' partial Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 56 ) is granted. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/10/2018. (JLG)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' partial Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 41 ) is granted. Counts 6, 7, 10 and 11 are dismissed. The case shall proceed as to the remaining Counts in the Intervening Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/30/2017. (JLG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Trumbull Metropolitan Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle L. Heyer
Represented By: Heather Tonsing Volosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull Metropolitan Housing Authority
Represented By: Matthew M. Ries
Represented By: Daniel P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Osman
Represented By: Matthew M. Ries
Represented By: Daniel P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Simeon
Represented By: Matthew M. Ries
Represented By: Daniel P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?