Vayda v. R&J Trucking Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Vayda, Juan Ramirez, Benjamin Young, Richard Mills, Randy Smith, Andrew Basden, Steve Rice, Jeffrey Lynn Murphy, Lewis Logsdon, Lee Henderson, Daniel Taylor, Earl D. Kirkwood, Roman Korkots, Joseph Hambly, Matthew D. Ison, Greg Kennedy, Milton Gover, Mark Craighead, Stephen Vanzant, John Dean, Marshall Swigart, Paul Wieland, Thomas Carter, Ray Clark, Christopher Kruegeger, Jerah Hansen, Nicholas Basista, Steven W. Ruef, Cody Ison, James Crawford, Curtis Williams, Clarence Walker, Norman Morehead, David Madison, Richard Vayda, Robert Bahan, Eddie Anderson, Robert White, Todd Mendenhall, Josh Ryan, David Erisman, Mark Clever, Arron Lewis, Tracy Mullen, Michael Houff, Tyrone Quisenberry, Richard Pottorf, Timothy Donohoo, John Turner, Jackie Rucker, Iler Crawford, Thomas Fisher, Curtis Menne, Gregory Brammer, Ronda Myrick, Gerald Schigel, Scott McCarty, Kenneth Rowsom, Mark Christo, David MacAleese, Leroy Garner, George Kovolenko, Ronald Ouellette and Marcus McCreary
Defendant: R&J Trucking Co., Inc. and Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00408
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Mahoning
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Filing 55 Notice of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Jerah Hansen, #2 Consent of Roman Korkots)(Draher, Shannon)
January 12, 2018 Filing 54 Notice of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Iller Crawford Consent, #2 Exhibit Greg Kennedy Consent, #3 Exhibit George Kovolenko Consent, #4 Exhibit Christopher Kruegeger Consent, #5 Exhibit Curtis Williams Consent)(Draher, Shannon)
January 5, 2018 Filing 53 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Benjamin Young, #2 Consent of Gregory Brammer, #3 Consent of Clarence Walker)(Draher, Shannon)
January 4, 2018 Filing 52 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Robert White)(Draher, Shannon)
January 3, 2018 Filing 51 Notice of Filing Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Thomas Carter, #2 Consent of Milton Gover, #3 Consent of Joseph Hambly)(Draher, Shannon)
December 29, 2017 Filing 50 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Matthew D. Ison, #2 Consent of Earl D. Kirkwood, #3 Consent of Jeffrey Lynn Murphy, #4 Consent of Juan Ramirez, #5 Consent of Steven W. Ruef)(Draher, Shannon)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order of Dismissal and approving settlement (related doc #48 ). This case is dismissed with prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/29/2017.(C,KA)
November 14, 2017 Filing 48 Joint SEALED Motion for Approval of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice #45 filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc., Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #45 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order of Dismissal and Approving Settlement, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Shannon M. Draher)(Wymer, Martin) Counsel notified regarding certificate of service. Modified text 11/15/2017 (C,KA).
November 14, 2017 Filing 47 Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Wymer, Martin)
November 9, 2017 Filing 46 Second Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Richard Vayda. (Draher, Shannon)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order of Dismissal. The docket shall be marked settled and dismissed without prejudice.Not later than 14 days from the date of this order, the parties shall jointly submit a Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement (to include Confidential Settlement Agreement under Seal) and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, which, if approved, shall supersede this Order. Parties' joint motion #44 for leave to file Confidential Settlement Agreement under seal is denied as moot. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/9/2017(C,KA)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Related Doc #43 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/9/2017(C,KA)
November 6, 2017 Filing 44 Joint Motion for leave to File Confidential Settlement Agreement Under Seal filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc., Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wymer, Martin)
November 3, 2017 Filing 43 Joint Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Second Amended Collective Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Order)(Draher, Shannon) Modified text on 11/6/2017 (S,L).
September 1, 2017 Filing 42 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Leroy Garner, #2 Consent of Randy Smith)(Draher, Shannon)
August 24, 2017 Filing 41 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Daniel Taylor)(Draher, Shannon)
August 22, 2017 Filing 40 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Tracy Mullen)(Draher, Shannon)
August 21, 2017 Filing 39 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Arron Lewis, #2 Consent of Cody Ison, #3 Consent of Marshall Swigart)(Draher, Shannon)
August 10, 2017 Filing 38 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Josh Ryan)(Draher, Shannon)
August 7, 2017 Filing 37 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of David MacAleese)(Draher, Shannon)
August 2, 2017 Filing 36 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Marcus McCreary)(Draher, Shannon)
August 1, 2017 Filing 35 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Timothy Donohoo)(Draher, Shannon)
July 28, 2017 Filing 34 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Ronald Ouellette, #2 Consent of Mark Clever, #3 Consent of Thomas Teeple)(Draher, Shannon)
July 27, 2017 Filing 33 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Robert Bahan, #2 Consent of Michael Houff)(Draher, Shannon)
July 26, 2017 Filing 32 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Thomas Fisher)(Draher, Shannon)
July 21, 2017 Filing 31 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of John Dean, #2 Consent of Nicholas Basista)(Draher, Shannon)
July 20, 2017 Filing 30 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Lewis Logsdon)(Draher, Shannon)
July 19, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/19/2017. Present were Attorney Hans A. Nilges as counsel for Plaintiff and Attorneys Martin T. Wymer and Martin J. Boetcher as counsel for Defendants. Parties' Joint Proposed Stipulation (ECF No. #23 ) is approved. Should either party require more formalization of the class certification, the parties shall jointly propose a schedule, within the Case Management Plan's cutoffs, to the Court. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 27 Minutes. (JLG)
July 18, 2017 Filing 29 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of David Erisman, #2 Consent of Norman Morehead, #3 Consent of John Turner, #4 Consent of Scott McCarty, #5 Consent of Stephen Vanzant, #6 Consent of Tyrone Quisenberry)(Draher, Shannon)
July 17, 2017 Filing 28 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Kenneth Rowsom, #2 Consent of Richard Mills, #3 Consent of Todd Mendenhall, #4 Consent of Eddie Anderson, #5 Consent of Andrew Basden, #6 Consent of David Madison, #7 Consent of Mark Craighead, #8 Consent of James Crawford)(Draher, Shannon)
July 14, 2017 Filing 27 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Gerald Schigel, #2 Consent of Jackie Rucker, #3 Consent of Lee Henderson, #4 Consent of Mark Christo, #5 Consent of Paul Wieland, #6 Consent of Ray Clark, #7 Consent of Richard Pottorf, #8 Consent of Richard Vayda, #9 Consent of Ronda Myrick)(Draher, Shannon)
July 13, 2017 Filing 26 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Steve Rice, #2 Consent of Curtis Menne)(Draher, Shannon)
June 14, 2017 IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: The Telephonic Status Conference is reset for 7/19/2017 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Lead counsel must be present unless excused by the Court upon written motion. Parties' attendance is welcome, but not mandatory. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435 with all participants on the line. Related document(s) #20 . (JLG)
June 2, 2017 Filing 25 Answer to #15 Amended complaint, with Jury Demand filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc., Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.. (Wymer, Martin)
June 2, 2017 Filing 24 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Defendant Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc. on 5/31/2017, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Vayda. (H,SN)
June 2, 2017 Filing 23 Joint Proposed Stipulation to Provide Court-Approved Notice of Collective Action filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Form)(Wymer, Martin)
May 30, 2017 Service by Clerk. Summons and Amended Complaint addressed to Defendant Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 1970 0000 4078 7388. (H,SN)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 6/2/2017, to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and to file a Joint Stipulation addressing the provision of notice to Plaintiff's proposed FLSA 16(b) collective as agreed in the parties Joint Status Report. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/30/2017. (E,CK)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Attorneys Martin T. Wymer and Carrie A. Valdez of Baker & Hostetler LLP, #21 Motion for leave to Appear as lead counsel, as substitute for Attorneys Steven E. Seasly, Kara D. Williams, and Robert J. Bowes and the law firm of Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP. Attorney Martin J. Boetcher of Harrington, Hoppe & Mitchell, Ltd., will continue as co-counsel for Defendants. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/30/2017.(E,CK)
May 25, 2017 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 2, 2017 to file responsive pleading and file stipulation concerning class notice filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc., Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc. (Wymer, Martin)
May 25, 2017 Filing 21 Motion for leave to Appear as Substitute Counsel for Defendants filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc., Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.. (Wymer, Martin)
May 19, 2017 Filing 20 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. This case is not suitable for Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) at this time. The parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge. The cutoff for all discovery shall be November 20, 2017. The cutoff to amend pleadings and add parties is May 12, 2017. The cutoff for filing dispositive motions is January 31, 2018. Responses shall be filed byMarch 2, 2018 and Replies by March 16, 2018.A Status Conference will be held on 6/26/2017 at 12:00 p.m., noon. The conference will be conducted via telephone unless circumstances require otherwise. Lead counsel must be present unless excused by the Court upon written motion. Parties' attendance is welcome, but not mandatory. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the conference call and contact chambers directly at 330-884-7435 with all participants on the line. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/19/17.(C,KA)
May 16, 2017 Filing 19 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc. (S,L)
May 12, 2017 Filing 18 Joint Status Report filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Kara)
May 12, 2017 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Martin J. Boetcher of Harrington, Hoppe & Mitchell Ltd. filed by on behalf of Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #15 .(Boetcher, Martin)
May 12, 2017 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Kara D. Williams filed by on behalf of Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.. (Williams, Kara)
May 12, 2017 Filing 15 Amended complaint against R&J Trucking Co., Inc., Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc. and adding new party defendants Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc. Filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.) (Draher, Shannon) Modified on 5/16/2017 (S,L).
May 3, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/3/2017. Present were Attorney Shannon M. Draher as counsel for Plaintiff; and Attorneys Kara D. Williams and Martin A. Boetcher as counsel for Defendant. Also present were Plaintiff Richard Vayda and Ann Marie Naples as party representative for Defendant. By 5/12/2017, parties shall file a joint notice informing the Court as to whether the parties have reached a tolling agreement. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 36 Minutes. (JLG)
May 3, 2017 Filing 14 Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by Richard Vayda. (Draher, Shannon)
May 2, 2017 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Martin J. Boetcher of Harrington, Hoppe & Mitchell, Ltd. filed by on behalf of R&J Trucking Co., Inc.. (Boetcher, Martin)
April 26, 2017 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc.. (Williams, Kara)
April 26, 2017 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by R&J Trucking Co., Inc.. (Williams, Kara)
April 20, 2017 Filing 10 Stipulated Protective Order modified so that parties will file documents under seal electronically and not provide hard copies to Chambers. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/20/2017. (JLG)
April 18, 2017 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Discovery Plan), parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Richard Vayda. (Draher, Shannon)
April 18, 2017 Filing 8 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Richard Vayda. (Draher, Shannon) Modified text on 4/18/2017 (S,L).
April 4, 2017 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 5/3/2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendant's #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 4/26/2017 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/29/2017. (JLG)
March 22, 2017 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 4/26/2017 to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint #1 filed by Defendant R&J Trucking Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seasly, Steven) Modified on 3/23/2017 to edit text and attachment description (D,TM).
March 22, 2017 Filing 5 Attorney Appearances of Steven E. Seasly, Kara D. Williams and Robert J. Bowes filed by on behalf of R&J Trucking Co., Inc.. (Seasly, Steven) Modified on 3/23/2017 to add other counsel names to docket (D,TM).
March 9, 2017 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Defendant R&J Trucking Co., Inc. on 3/6/2017, filed on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Vayda. (H,SN)
March 7, 2017 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Richard Vayda)(Nilges, Hans)
March 3, 2017 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to R&J Trucking Co., Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail mail. Receipt # 7016 1970 0000 4078 7050. (S,L)
February 28, 2017 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Defendant R&J Trucking Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,SN)
February 28, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (H,SN)
February 28, 2017 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (H,SN)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against R&J Trucking Co., Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8044493.. Filed by Richard Vayda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Draher, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vayda v. R&J Trucking Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vayda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramirez
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Young
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mills
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Smith
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Basden
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Rice
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lynn Murphy
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Logsdon
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Henderson
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl D. Kirkwood
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Korkots
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hambly
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D. Ison
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Kennedy
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gover
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Craighead
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Vanzant
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dean
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Swigart
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wieland
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Carter
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Clark
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kruegeger
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerah Hansen
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Basista
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven W. Ruef
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Ison
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Crawford
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Williams
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Walker
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Morehead
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Madison
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Vayda
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bahan
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Anderson
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert White
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Mendenhall
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Ryan
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Erisman
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Clever
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Lewis
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Mullen
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Houff
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Quisenberry
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Pottorf
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Donohoo
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Turner
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Rucker
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iler Crawford
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Menne
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Brammer
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Myrick
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Schigel
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McCarty
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rowsom
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Christo
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David MacAleese
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Garner
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kovolenko
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ouellette
Represented By: Michaela M. Calhoun
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus McCreary
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&J Trucking Co., Inc.
Represented By: Carrie A. Valdez
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Martin J. Boetcher
Represented By: Robert J. Bowes, III
Represented By: Steven E. Seasly
Represented By: Kara D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Carrocce Trucking Company, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie A. Valdez
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Martin J. Boetcher
Represented By: Kara D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?