Mitri v. Rahma et al
Plaintiff: Issa Mitri and Issa J. Mitri
Defendant: Mohammad Hajjawi, Nabil Abu Rahma and Lena Amad Esmail
Case Number: 4:2018cv02258
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 Motion for extension of time until June 24, 2019 to Respond to Defendant Nabil Abu Rahma's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Issa J. Mitri. Related document(s) #22 . (Orille, Scott)
June 11, 2019 Copy of 6/11/2019 non-document Order on Motion for leave mailed to Nabil Abu Rahma at 245 Trumbull Ave., Youngstown, OH 44505 on 6/11/2019. (O,K)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The motion (Doc. No. #23 ) of defendants Lena Amad Esmail and Mohammad Hajjawi for a second extension of time of 30 days in which to answer the amended complaint is GRANTED. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/11/2019. (O,K)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 Motion for Second Thirty (30) Day Leave to Plead to First Amended Complaint filed by Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi. Related document(s) #19 , #20 . (Cochran, Scott)
May 31, 2019 Copy of NEF for Remark by Clerk re Default mailed to Nabil Abu Rahma at 245 Trumbull Ave., Youngstown, Ohio 44505 on 5/31/19. (S,HR)
May 31, 2019 Remark by Clerk. Default was not entered because service was not done in accordance with Rules [Local Rule 4.2, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4, Ohio Rules of Civil Procedure 4.1]. Service by certified mail must be done by the Clerk. Related document(s) #21 . (S,HR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to dismiss filed by Nabil Abu Rahma. (S,Ke) Per chambers, modified to motion event. NEF regenerated. (S,HR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Nabil Abu Rahma filed by Issa J. Mitri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott J. Orille)(Orille, Scott)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion for leave to plead (Related Doc #20 ). Lena Amad Esmail and Mohammad Hajjawi shall have thirty (30) days in which to file a responsive pleading to the first amended complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/14/2019. (O,K)
May 10, 2019 Filing 20 Motion for leave to Plead on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi. Related document(s) #19 . (Cochran, Scott)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 First Amended complaint for money damages, with jury demand, against all defendants, filed by Issa J. Mitri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Limited Power of Attorney, #2 Exhibit Close Corporation Agreement, #3 Exhibit Agreement, #4 Exhibit General Partnership Agreement) (Orille, Scott)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. No. #17 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint (Doc. No. #17 -1) within seven (7) days of this order. As the amended complaint will supersede the complaint, see B & H Med., LLC v. ABP Admin., Inc., 526 F.3d 257, 267 n.8 (6th Cir. 2008), defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint (Doc. No. #13 ) is denied without prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/19/2019. (P,J)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Issa J. Mitri. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A. Limited Power of Attorney, #3 Exhibit B Close Corporation Agreement, #4 Exhibit C Agreement, #5 Exhibit D General Partnership Agreement)(Orille, Scott)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss , with Memorandum in Support, filed by Issa J. Mitri. Related document(s) #13 . (Orille, Scott)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #15 plaintiff's motion for extension of time until 12/21/2018 to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/18/2018.(P,J)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Motion for extension of time until December 21, 2018 in which to respond to Defendants' #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Issa J. Mitri. (Orille, Scott)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #14 motion by plaintiff for extension of time until 12/17/2018 to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/7/2018.(P,J)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 Motion for extension of time until December 17, 2018 to respond to Defendants' #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Issa J. Mitri. Related document(s) #13 . (Orille, Scott)
November 23, 2018 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss counts one and two of the Compliant, and Motion by defendant, Hajjawi, to dismiss count four of the Compliant with Memorandum in Support, filed by Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi. Related document(s) #1 . (Cochran, Scott)
November 23, 2018 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi. (Cochran, Scott)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 motion by defendants Lena Amad Esmail and Mohammad Hajjawi for leave to plead for 30 days. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/25/2018.(P,J)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for leave (thirty day) to Plead filed by Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi. Related document(s) #1 . (Cochran, Scott)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Nabil Abu Rahma on 10/5/2018, filed on behalf of Issa J. Mitri Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Orille, Scott)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Lena Amad Esmail on 10/5/2018, filed on behalf of Issa J. Mitri Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Orille, Scott)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Mohammad Hajjawi on 10/5/2018, filed on behalf of Issa J. Mitri Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Orille, Scott)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi, Nabil Abu Rahma. (T,Je)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Issa Mitri. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mohammad Hajjawi)(Orille, Scott)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Issa Mitri. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lena Amad Esmail, #2 Summons Mohammad Hajjawi, #3 Summons Nabil Abu Rahma)(Orille, Scott)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons provided. No Summons issued. (S,Ke)
October 1, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
October 1, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,Ke)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Issa J. Mitri. Related document(s) #1 . (Orille, Scott)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for money damages with jury demand against Lena Amad Esmail, Mohammad Hajjawi, Nabil Abu Rahma. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8934096. Filed by Issa J. Mitri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Limited Power of Attorney, #2 Exhibit B Close Corporation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Agreement) (Orille, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitri v. Rahma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issa Mitri
Represented By: Scott J. Orille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issa J. Mitri
Represented By: Scott J. Orille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Hajjawi
Represented By: Scott R. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabil Abu Rahma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lena Amad Esmail
Represented By: Scott R. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?