Bracetty et al v. Vision Property Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Wingert, Yolanda Bracetty, Justin Kennedy, Justine Reynolds Nieves and Linda Lou Fekety
Defendant: DSV SPV 2, LLC, PA Seven, LLC, Alan Investments III, LLC, Alex Szkaradek, DSV SPV 1, LLC, Mahoning County Treasurer, RVFM 11 Series, LLC, DSV SPV 3, LLC, City of Youngstown, Mahoning County Auditor, Steven Randall, Vision Property Management, LLC, Kaja Holdings 2, LLC and VPM Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02460
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court therefore stays the matter until 1/8/2019. Defendant City of Youngstown's obligation to answer or otherwise respond is extended until 1/8/2019. The Vision Defendants' (including all entity Defendants as well as Alex Szkaradek and Steven Randall) obligation to answer or otherwise respond is also extended until 1/8/2019. Plaintiffs shall file a motion to remand, if any, by 1/16/2019. If the parties wish to sustain the effect of the temporary restraining order beyond 1/8/2019, they shall notify the Court by that date. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/16/2018. (JLG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time until 11/30/2018 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant City of Youngstown. Related document(s) #1 . (Schor, Neil)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until December 24, 2018 to File Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Yolanda Bracetty, Linda Lou Fekety, Justin Kennedy, Justine Reynolds Nieves, Shawn Wingert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nader, Rachel)
November 9, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Conference held on 11/9/2018. Present were Attorneys Michelle A. Wrona, Patricia Dougan, and Rachel E. Nader for Plaintiffs; Attorney Kerri L. Keller for the Vision Defendants; Attorney Thomas N. Michaels for Defendants Mahoning County Treasurer and Auditor; and Attorney Jeff Limbian for Defendant City of Youngstown. Also present was Attorney Alex Quay as Party Representative for the Vision Defendants. The parties discussed the procedural posture of the case. The parties agreed to sustain the effect of the state-court Temporary Restraining Order (dated 10/15/2018) for 60 days from the date of this conference, until 1/8/2019. Defendant City of Youngstown will move for leave to file an answer no later than 12/10/2018. Plaintiffs will move to extend the cutoff date by which they must file for remand to state court by 30 days from which the motion otherwise would have been due. A separate Order summarizing the parties' obligations will issue. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 45 minutes. (JLG)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint until 11/29/2018 filed by Defendants Vision Property Management, LLC, VPM Holdings, LLC, RVFM 11 Series, LLC, Kaja Holdings 2, LLC, DSV SPV 1, LLC, DSV SPV 2, LLC, DSV SPV 3, LLC, Alan Investments III, LLC, PA Seven, LLC, Alex Szkaradek, and Steven Randall. In order to discuss both unanimity of consent to remove and the Court's subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court will conduct a telephonic conference with all counsel of record on 11/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Parties' attendance is not necessary. Lead counsel must be present. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435 with all participants on the line. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/7/2018. (JLG)
November 7, 2018 IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: The Telephonic Conference is reset for 11/9/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Note that this is a time change only. Parties' attendance is not necessary. Lead counsel must be present. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435 with all participants on the line. Related document(s) #6 . (JLG)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Mahoning County Auditor, Mahoning County Treasurer. (Michaels, Thomas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Alan Investments III, LLC, DSV SPV 1, LLC, DSV SPV 2, LLC, DSV SPV 3, LLC, Kaja Holdings 2, LLC, PA Seven, LLC, RVFM 11 Series, LLC, Steven Randall, Alex Szkaradek, VPM Holdings, LLC, Vision Property Management, LLC. (Quay, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Alan Investments III, LLC, DSV SPV 1, LLC, DSV SPV 2, LLC, DSV SPV 3, LLC, Kaja Holdings 2, LLC, PA Seven, LLC, RVFM 11 Series, LLC, VPM Holdings, LLC, Vision Property Management, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Keller, Kerri)
October 25, 2018 Notice to Attorney Ken A. Mirkin and Michael Kachelries. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
October 25, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,Ke)
October 25, 2018 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8975207.. Filed by DSV SPV 2, LLC, VPM Holdings, LLC, Alan Investments III, LLC, Vision Property Management, LLC, Kaja Holdings 2, LLC, DSV SPV 3, LLC, PA Seven, LLC, RVFM 11 Series, LLC, DSV SPV 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal) (Keller, Kerri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bracetty et al v. Vision Property Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSV SPV 2, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Seven, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Investments III, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Szkaradek
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSV SPV 1, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoning County Treasurer
Represented By: Thomas N. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVFM 11 Series, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSV SPV 3, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Youngstown
Represented By: Neil D. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoning County Auditor
Represented By: Thomas N. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Randall
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaja Holdings 2, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VPM Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kerri L. Keller
Represented By: James Alex Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Wingert
Represented By: Michael Kachelries
Represented By: Patricia Dougan
Represented By: Michelle A. Wrona
Represented By: Ken A. Mirkin
Represented By: Rachel E. Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Bracetty
Represented By: Michael Kachelries
Represented By: Rachel E. Nader
Represented By: Patricia Dougan
Represented By: Michelle A. Wrona
Represented By: Ken A. Mirkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Kennedy
Represented By: Michael Kachelries
Represented By: Patricia Dougan
Represented By: Michelle A. Wrona
Represented By: Ken A. Mirkin
Represented By: Rachel E. Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Reynolds Nieves
Represented By: Michael Kachelries
Represented By: Patricia Dougan
Represented By: Michelle A. Wrona
Represented By: Ken A. Mirkin
Represented By: Rachel E. Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lou Fekety
Represented By: Michael Kachelries
Represented By: Patricia Dougan
Represented By: Michelle A. Wrona
Represented By: Ken A. Mirkin
Represented By: Rachel E. Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?