Bartholomew v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Bartholomew
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01053
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/1/19. All deadlines and hearings set by the previous District Judge are terminated and will be reset forthwith. (D,MA)
July 1, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela A. Barker pursuant to General Order 2019-13. (S,Ke)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian N. Mazzola for Plaintiff Jessica Bartholomew. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/18/2019. (JLG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Brian N. Mazzola to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9358266, with affidavit filed by Plaintiff Jessica Bartholomew. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klein, Larry - signature by Christopher J. Carney)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.'s unopposed #12 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. As the Court is unable to accommodate the proposed dates for rescheduling, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is reset for 8/12/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/7/2019. (JLG)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for a continuance of the Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. Related document(s) #5 . (Schwallie, Halden)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial as to #1 Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (Holt, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Scott M. Sarason filed by on behalf of Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Sarason, Scott)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Michael R. Holt filed by on behalf of Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Holt, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys Scott M. Sarason and Michael R. Holt for Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Document(s) #6 , #7 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/14/2019. (JLG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Michael R. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9306812, filed by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael R. Holt, #2 Proposed Order)(Schwallie, Halden)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Scott M. Sarason to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9306802, filed by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott M. Sarason, #2 Proposed Order)(Schwallie, Halden)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 7/22/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke)
May 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
May 10, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BRP Inc. for Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. filed by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Schwallie, Halden)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Schwallie, Halden)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas for Mahoning County, case number 2019 CV 00764 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9303033.. Filed by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pollack, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartholomew v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bartholomew
Represented By: Larry S. Klein
Represented By: Christopher James Carney
Represented By: Brian N. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Represented By: Halden R. Schwallie
Represented By: Lawrence D. Pollack
Represented By: Michael R. Holt
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?