Sweeting v. Department of Rehabilitation and Correction et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Sweeting
Defendant: Department of Rehabilitation and Corection, Remish, Palmer, Roger Wolfe and Seech Ceo
Case Number: 4:2019cv01454
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement to #4 Complaint, filed by Derrick Sweeting. (Attachments: #1 Additional Evidence to Claims and Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (E,CK)
June 24, 2019 Copy of Docket Sheet mailed to Derrick Sweeting #679-018 at Ohio State Penitentiary, 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Road, Youngstown, Ohio 44505 on 06/24/2019. (Y,Br)
June 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,Br)
June 24, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (Y,Br)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-00459. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 24, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sct) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of Courts to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/24/19. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Complaint with jury demand against Department of Rehabilitation and Corection, Palmer, Remish, Seech Ceo, Roger Wolfe. Filing fee not paid... Filed by Derrick Sweeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Various Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Front Page)) (Y,Br)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Copies of Complaint, Summons, and USM285 forms) by Plaintiff Derrick Sweeting. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (sct) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeting v. Department of Rehabilitation and Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Rehabilitation and Corection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seech Ceo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Sweeting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?