Washington v. Cellco Partnership
Plaintiff: Crystal Washington
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Case Number: 4:2019cv01565
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Dicus, Elizabeth)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Cellco Partnership. (Dicus, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 9/30/2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Discovery Protocols Order. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/14/2019. (JLG)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendant's #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 9/5/2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/5/2019. (JLG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC, Other Affiliate Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems LLC, Other Affiliate Verizon Americas Inc., Other Affiliate GTE Wireless LLC, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless of the Midwest Incorporated for Cellco Partnership filed by Cellco Partnership. (Dicus, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 5, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Dicus, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon defendant Cellco Partnership on 7/18/2019, filed on behalf of Crystal Washington. (E,CK)
July 16, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Cellco Partnership placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 1130 0001 9212 0307. (R,Li)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,Ke)
July 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
July 10, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9406197.. Filed by Crystal Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Cellco) (Bean, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Cellco Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Washington
Represented By: Frederick M. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Dicus
Represented By: Tonya B. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?