Johnson v. Belmont Confections, Inc.
Plaintiff: Austin Johnson
Defendant: Belmont Confections, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01588
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Austin Johnson. Belmont Confections, Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 filed on behalf of Austin Johnson (Makridis, Irene)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Belmont Confections, Inc. (at two addresses). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Austin Johnson. (Makridis, Irene)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Austin Johnson. (Makridis, Irene)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Austin Johnson. (Makridis, Irene)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Belmont Confections, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9412460. Filed by Austin Johnson. (Makridis, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Belmont Confections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont Confections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Johnson
Represented By: Irene K. Makridis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?