Daniels v. Mellace Family Brands California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melzia Daniels
Defendant: Mellace Family Brands Johnvince Food, Corptemps, Inc, Mellace Family Brands California, Inc. and Mellace Family Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02378
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Mellace Family Brands Johnvince Food. Service attempted by certified mail on 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Melzia Daniels Related document(s) #2 . (L,MI)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Mellace Family Brands, Inc.. Service attempted by certified mail on 11/2/2019 filed on behalf of Melzia Daniels. Related Document #2 . (H,SP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Mellace Family Brands California, Inc.. Service attempted by certified mail on 11/2/2019 filed on behalf of Melzia Daniels. Related Document #2 . (H,SP)
October 18, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Corptemps, Inc c/o Satish K. Tandon Receipt # 7018 1130 0001 9212 0765, Mellace Family Brands California, Inc. Receipt # 7018 1130 0001 9212 0758, Mellace Family Brands Johnvince Food Receipt # 7018 1130 0001 9212 0772, Mellace Family Brands, Inc. Receipt # 7018 1130 0001 9212 0789 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Related Document #2 . (S,AN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Mellace Family Brands California, Inc., Corptemps, Inc., Mellace Family Brands, Inc., and Mellace Family Brands Johnvince Food. (Attachment: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (W,K)
October 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (W,K)
October 15, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (W,K)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages and Reinstatement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9572328. Filed by Melzia Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons FB California, #4 Summons Cortemps, #5 Summons FB, #6 Summons FB Johnvince) (Breedlove, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Mellace Family Brands California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellace Family Brands Johnvince Food
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corptemps, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellace Family Brands California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellace Family Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melzia Daniels
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Represented By: Frederick M. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?