United States of America v. $26,000.00 U.S. Currency, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $26,000.00 U.S. Currency and VIN: 1G6KD5EY2AU133719
Interested Party: Michael Lewis
Case Number: 4:2019cv02592
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Marshal's Return on Warrant of Arrest in Rem $26,000 USC was taken into USMS custody on 6/4/19 and Vehicle was taken into USMS custody on 6/12/19 filed by United States of America. (J,FE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michael Lewis c/o Stanley T. Booker, Esq. on 11/8/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued to U.S. Marshal on 11/6/2019 for $26,000.00 U.S. Currency and VIN: 1G6KD5EY2AU133719. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,Ke)
November 6, 2019 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Michael Lewis placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70140150000158886804. (B,R)
November 6, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,R)
November 6, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,R)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Morford, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $26,000.00 U.S. Currency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $26,000.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN: 1G6KD5EY2AU133719
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James L. Morford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?