Cook et al v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Cook, The Financial Concept Group and Financial Concept Group
Defendant: John Doe Corporation, AIG Property Casualty and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02655
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 Response to #7 Motion to remand case filed by AIG Property Casualty, John Doe Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Offer to Stipulate to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2: Stipulation to Remand to the Court of Common Pleas for Mahoning County, Ohio)(Janik, Steven)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by AIG Property Casualty, John Doe Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company. (Janik, Steven)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint and Opposition to Plaintiffs' #7 motion to remand is now due 1/3/20. No further extensions will be granted. Judge John R. Adams on 12/27/2019.(M,TL)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for extension of time until 1/3/20 to answer , move, or plead to Complaint, Motion for extension of time until 1/3/20 to file response/reply to #7 Motion to remand case filed by AIG Property Casualty, John Doe Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 , #7 . (Janik, Steven)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' #7 Motion to Remand and answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before December 27, 2019. Judge John R. Adams on 12/19/19.(S,HR)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 27, 2019 to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by AIG Property Casualty, John Doe Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 , #7 . (Janik, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #8 Motion for extension of time to respond to #7 Motion to Remand, and for additional time to answer Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand on or before December 17, 2019. Judge John R. Adams on 12/5/19.(S,HR)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 17, 2019 to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by AIG Property Casualty, John Doe Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 , #7 . (Janik, Steven)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to remand case filed by Jeffrey S. Cook, The Financial Concept Group. (Gentile, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AIG Property Casualty answer due 12/9/2019; John Doe Corporation answer due 12/9/2019; Lexington Insurance Company answer due 12/9/2019. Judge John R. Adams on 11/20/19.(K,C)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 9, 2019 to answer, move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants AIG Property Casualty, John Doe Corporation, and Lexington Insurance Company. (Janik, Steven)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,R)
November 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,R)
November 13, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,R)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Janik, Steven)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. for AIG Property Casualty filed by AIG Property Casualty. (Janik, Steven)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Mahoning County, Ohio, case number 19cv2052 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9626032.. Filed by AIG Property Casualty, Lexington Insurance Company, John Doe Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Janik, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Represented By: Crystal L. Maluchnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Represented By: Crystal L. Maluchnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Represented By: Crystal L. Maluchnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Cook
Represented By: James S. Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Financial Concept Group
Represented By: James S. Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Concept Group
Represented By: James S. Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?