Smith v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Appellant: Ronald Joseph Smith
Appellee: U.S. Bank N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02682
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Expedited Motion for Extension of Time of 45 days to to File Opening Brief filed by Appellant Ronald Joseph Smith. (W,K)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Determine Mootness of Controversy and to Dismiss Underlying Case if Mootness Found filed by Appellant Ronald Joseph Smith. (W,K)
December 20, 2019 Copy of #7 Notice mailed to Appellant Ronald Joseph Smith, 1625 Gully Top Lane, Canfield, OH 44406 on 12/20/2019. Related document(s) #7 . (JLG)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Filing an Appeal from a Bankruptcy Judge's Decision Appellant Ronald J. Smith shall serve and file his brief (not to exceed 30 pages) within 30 days after this Order has been filed, pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018.1 Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. shall serve and file its brief (not to exceed 30 pages) within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Appellant may serve and file a reply brief (not to exceed 15 pages) within 14 days after service of Appellee's brief. Oral argument on appeals shall not be heard unless written application is made and the Court determines that oral argument would be beneficial in resolving the issues. All briefs must be served on adverse parties. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/20/2019. (JLG)
December 20, 2019 Copy of #6 Memorandum of Opinion and Order mailed to Appellant Ronald Joseph Smith, 1625 Gully Top Lane, Canfield, OH 44406 on 12/20/2019. Related document(s) #6 . (JLG)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Appellant Ronald J. Smith's Motion for Recusal, ECF No. #3 , is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/20/2019. (JLG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (S,Ke)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Transcript of U.S Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 9/12/2019. (S,Ke)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Recusal filed by Appellant Ronald Joseph Smith. (W,K)
November 15, 2019 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Russ Kendig, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 19-40227, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (W,K)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (W,K)
November 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (W,K)
November 15, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (W,K)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Orders dated 06/05/2019, 07/15/2019, 09/30/2019, and 11/01/2019. Filed by Ronald Joseph Smith. (Attachments: #1 Transmission Form, #2 USBC Order dated 06/05/2019, #3 USBC Order dated 07/15/2019, #4 USBC Order dated 09/30/2019, #5 USBC Order dated 11/01/2019, #6 USBC Docket Sheet) (W,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronald Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Stephen R. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?