Thomspon v. Animal Welfare League of Trumbull County, Inc, et al.
Plaintiff: Lucie M. Thomspon
Defendant: Does 1-10, Honorable Robert M. Platt, Animal Welfare League of Trumbull County, Inc., Ronald Mann, Honorable Thomas A. Campbell, Brookfield Township, Aaron Kasiewicz, Happy Trails Farm Animal Sanctuary, Inc., Harold Firster and Does 1-10, In Their Individual Capacities
Case Number: 4:2019cv02706
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
November 27, 2019 The filer is advised that the U.S. Marshal Service requires a USM Form 285 for each individual, company, or corporation to be served. The USM Form 285 can be found at www.uscourts.gov under# Forms. Related document #1 (W,K)
November 19, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, Judge John R. Adams terminated. (M,TL)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge John R. Adams on 11/19/19. (K,C)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILLING ERROR - summons issued prematurely: Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Animal Welfare League of Trumbull County, Inc., Brookfield Township, Thomas A. Campbell, Harold Firster, Happy Trails Farm Animal Sanctuary, Inc., Aaron Kasiewicz, Ronald Mann, Robert M. Platt. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (W,K) Modified on 11/27/2019 (W,K). Modified on 11/27/2019 (W,K).
November 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (W,K)
November 18, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (W,K)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lucie M. Thomspon. (Huth, Michela)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Civil Rights Action (42 U.S.C. 1983) and Declaratory Relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Lucie M. Thomspon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Brookfield Township, #3 Summons Judge Campbell, #4 Summons Judge Platt, #5 Summons Animal Welfare League, #6 Summons Happy Trails Farm Animal Sanctuary, #7 Summons Kasiewicz, #8 Summons Mann, #9 Summons Firster) (Huth, Michela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomspon v. Animal Welfare League of Trumbull County, Inc, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Robert M. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Welfare League of Trumbull County, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Thomas A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Kasiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy Trails Farm Animal Sanctuary, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Firster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, In Their Individual Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucie M. Thomspon
Represented By: Richard B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Michela J. Huth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?