Williams v. Warden, Ohio Reformatory for Women
Petitioner: Benita Williams
Respondent: Teri Baldauf
Case Number: 4:2019cv02791
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/272019. (W,CM)
November 27, 2019 Notice to Attorney General of 2254 case transferred to Northern District of Ohio from Southern District of Ohio. (W,CM)
November 27, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (W,CM)
November 27, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (W,CM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-05185. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division, Youngstown.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 11/27/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - This case is SUA SPONTE TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, at Youngstown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 26, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 11/27/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 200COL059697. (jlk) Modified receipt number on 11/26/2019 (ew). [Transferred from ohsd on 11/27/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benita Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope - Side 1, #3 Envelope - Side 2) (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 11/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Warden, Ohio Reformatory for Women
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Teri Baldauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benita Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?