Chuey v. Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shawna L. Chuey
Defendant: Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01568
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #14 , #13 .(P,G)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Untimely Filing Due to Technical Difficulites filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #13 .(P,G)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Manual Filing of Report of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by Shawna L. Chuey. (P,G)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Demand Statement filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #9 , #8 . (P,G)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #9 , #8 .(P,G)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Untimely Filing filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #8 .(P,G)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Manual Filing of Initial Disclosures, Demand Statement, Declaration that Party Was Unable to File in a Timely Manner filed by Shawna L. Chuey. (P,G)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Copy of #6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Shawna L. Chuey at 436 E. Prospect Street, Girard, OH 44420 on 7/30/20. Related document(s) #6 . (K,C)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Telephone Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/14/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Defendant shall prepare the conference call-in information and provide the number to all parties and the Court two business days prior to the conference. Counsel and party representatives to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 7/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties, #2 Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #4 Budget, #5 Policy and Procedure Manual)(K,C)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Copy of Docket Sheet mailed to Shawna L. Chuey, 436 E. Prospect Street, Girard, OH 44420 on 7/16/2020. (S,Ke)
July 16, 2020 FILING ERROR - Notice by Clerk that Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,Ke) Modified to denote filing error on 7/16/2020 (S,Ke).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke)
July 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
July 16, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (S,Ke)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Winchester, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Trumbull County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020cv00723 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10110136.. Filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trumbull County Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket) (Winchester, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chuey v. Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna L. Chuey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian T. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?