El Digital Direct, LLC et al v. RNB Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: El Digital Direct, LLC, Sharon Pidgeon, Tarry Pidgeon and Envelope I, Inc.
Defendant: John and/or Jane Doe 1-5 and RNB Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01570
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Granting, for good cause shown, the parties' #12 joint motion to stay briefing on defendant's motion to dismiss. The parties have notified the Court that they are attempting to resolve this matter through private mediation. If the parties reach a resolution, they must promptly notify the Court and file a joint dismissal entry within 30 days. If mediation is unsuccessful, the parties will immediately notify the Court and a case management conference will be scheduled. In that case, plaintiffs' response in opposition to the motion to dismiss is due on or before 11/16/2020 and defendant's reply is due on or before 11/30/2020. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/28/2020. (O,K)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Motion to stay briefing and ruling on Defendant's motion to dismiss for sixty (60) days filed by El Digital Direct, LLC, Envelope I, Inc., Sharon Pidgeon, Tarry Pidgeon. Related document(s) #11 . (Yarwood, Ronald)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant RNB Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Shay Cohen)(Hogan, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint filed by RNB Associates, LLC. (Hogan, Christopher)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Granting, for good cause shown, defendant's #8 unopposed motion for an extension of time to file and answer. Defendant, RNB Associates, LLC, will have until August 14, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/3/2020. (E,CK)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time To Move And Plead In Response To Complaint filed by RNB Associates, LLC. Related document(s) #8 . (Hogan, Christopher)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Second Motion for extension of time until August 14, 2020 to answer filed by Defendant RNB Associates, LLC. (Hogan, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Granting, for good cause shown, defendant's #7 unopposed motion for an extension of time to file an answer. Defendant will have until July 31, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/23/2020. (E,CK)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 31, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant RNB Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hogan, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A- Witness List, #2 Appendix B- Exhibit List) (M,R)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RNB Associates, LLC. (Hogan, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR-(Attorney to refile)Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RNB Associates, LLC. (Hogan, Christopher) Modified on 7/17/2020 to denote filing error (M,R).
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by RNB Associates, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Hogan, Christopher)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Common Pleas Court of Mahoning County, Ohio, case number 2020CV971 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10110691.. Filed by RNB Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Court of Common Pleas Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Court of Common Pleas Summons , #3 Exhibit 3- Court of Common Pleas Notice of Filing) (Hogan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Digital Direct, LLC et al v. RNB Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Digital Direct, LLC
Represented By: Ronald D. Yarwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Pidgeon
Represented By: Ronald D. Yarwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarry Pidgeon
Represented By: Ronald D. Yarwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envelope I, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald D. Yarwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNB Associates, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?