Maldonado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Veronica Maldonado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv01632
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Attorney General via personal service on 8/4/2020; c/o US Attorney via FedEx on 8/5/20; c/o Regional Chief Counsel via FedEx on 8/5/20 signed C19 filed on behalf of Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #7 . (M,TL)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Certification that Social Security Number Sent to Defendant filed by Veronica Maldonado. (S,HR)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal on 7/27/2020 for service upon Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (P,G)
July 27, 2020 Copy of #6 Notice of Magistrate Consent form, #5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order, #4 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Veronica Maldonado 1825 Kimmel Street Youngstown, OH 44505 on 7/27/2020. (P,G)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (P,G)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Civil Rule 16.3.1)(P,G) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2020: #2 Amended Order (to correct plaintiff's name)) (S,HR). Order amended to correct plaintiff's first name and document added as attachment #2. NEF regenerated. (S,HR).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/27/2020.(P,G)
July 24, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (S,HR)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,R)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (M,R)
July 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,R)
July 23, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,R)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Veronica Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Victoria Maldonado, #2 Letter from PsyCare, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285, #6 Accudose Pharmacy medication information) (M,R) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #7 Redacted Complaint) (M,R).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?