Smith et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Smith and Nancy L. Smith
Defendant: U.S. Banks, NA, Manley Deas & Kochalski, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Carpenter Lipps & Leland, LLP, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, National Association and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv01826
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the motion for reconsideration re #11 (USCA# 20-3958). Circuit Judges: Rogers, Nalbandian, and Murphy. Date issued by USCA 9/22/20 (H,SP)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the motion to stay re #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 20-3958). Circuit Judges: Rogers, Nalbandian, and Murphy. Date issued by USCA 9/17/20 (H,SP)
September 16, 2020 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 20-3958). Date filed in USCA 9/15/20. (H,SP)
September 14, 2020 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 44660005570 (M,R)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #9 Memorandum of Opinion and Order of 9/10/20, filed by Nancy L. Smith, Ronald J. Smith. (Filing fee $505 paid, receipt # 44660005570) (R,Li)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Denying Plaintiffs' #7 Emergency Motion to alter/amend judgment and #8 Emergency Motion for Expedited Ruling on Pending 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Furthermore, Plaintiffs, jointly and individually, are enjoined from filing additional post-judgment motions in this case and are further enjoined from filing any new actions in this Court pertaining to the foreclosure or eviction actions. The Clerk's Office is ordered to return, unfiled, any additional post-judgment motions or new actions pertaining to the foreclosure or evictionactions. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/10/2020. (H,SP)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency Motion(Request) for Expedited Ruling on Pending 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Nancy L. Smith, Ronald J. Smith. (S,Ke)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Emergency Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule 59(e) and Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion (Immediate TRO Required) filed by Nancy L. Smith, Ronald J. Smith. Related document(s) #6 . (S,Ke)
August 28, 2020 Copy of #5 Memorandum of Opinion and Order and #6 Judgment Entry mailed to Plaintiff Ronald J. Smith, 1625 Gully Top Lane, Canfield, OH 44406 and Plaintiff Nancy L. Smith, 1625 Gully Top Lane, Canfield, OH 44406 on 8/28/2020. Related document(s) #5 , #6 . (JLG)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Judgment Entry Having filed its Memorandum of Opinion and Order, the Court hereby dismisses this action. Furthermore, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/28/2020. (JLG)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 65(b) (ECF No. #3 ) is denied and this action is dismissed. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/28/2020. (JLG)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons were provided and none issued. (M,R)
August 18, 2020 Financial Transaction in the amount of $400.00 received from Nancy L. Smith. Receipt # 44660005544 Related document(s) #1 . (M,R)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P Rule 65(b) filed by Nancy L. Smith, Ronald J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support)(M,R)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 3 Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P Rule 65(b) filed by Nancy L. Smith, Ronald J. Smith. (M,R) Modified on 8/19/2020 to denote Filing Error (M,R).
August 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,R)
August 18, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,R)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid.. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 4:19cv2682 and U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 19-402276th Circuit, 20-03150. Filed by Nancy L. Smith, Ronald J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (M,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Banks, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manley Deas & Kochalski, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter Lipps & Leland, LLP
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?