Maldonado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Veronica Maldonado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv01878
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Copy of #8 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Summons Issued, #10 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Veronica Maldonado,1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 10/20/2020. (G,CA)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/20/2020. (G,CA)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security (c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/20/2020. (G,CA)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Supplement (Summons) to #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(S,Ke)
September 16, 2020 Copy of #6 Order, U.S. Marshal forms and summonses mailed to Veronica Maldonado, 1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 9/16/2020. (G,CA)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order. The Plaintiff did not comply with the deficiency order #4 . On September 14, 2020, Plaintiff provided a Marshal form and summons only for the Commissioner of Social Security at an incorrect location. Given the Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court will allow the Plaintiff one more opportunity to provide the proper service forms. Plaintiff is allowed 30 days from the date of this order to provide necessary U.S. Marshal forms and summonses for all of the parties requiring service of process (i.e., the Commissioner of Social Security, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio). Clerk's Office is directed to send sufficient U.S. Marshal forms and summonses to the Plaintiff with a copy of the order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 9/16/2020. Related document #5 . (G,CA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement (Summons) to #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Unredacted, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285 Unredacted)(S,Ke)
August 26, 2020 Copy of #4 Order, U.S. Marshal forms and summonses mailed to Veronica Maldonado, 1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 8/26/2020. (G,CA)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order. Plaintiff to provide completed U.S. Marshal forms and Summonses for the parties requiring service (i.e., the Commissioner of Social Security, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio) within thirty (30) days of this order. Clerk's Office is directed to send sufficient U.S. Marshal forms and summonses to the Plaintiff with a copy of the order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/26/2020. (G,CA)
August 25, 2020 Copy of Automatic Reference of Administrative Action mailed to Veronica Maldonado at 1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 8/25/2020. (K,K)
August 25, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/25/2020. (K,K)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,R)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion to proceed in forma pauperis)(M,R)
August 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,R)
August 24, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (M,R)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP... Filed by Veronica Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Redacted Summons, #3 Redacted USM 285, #4 redacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado, #5 Redacted Letter from PsyCare, #6 Redacted Accusose Pharmacy, #7 Redacted Envelope, #8 Unredacted Complaint, #9 Unredacted Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Unredacted Summons, #11 Unredacted USM 285, #12 Unredacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado, #13 Unredacted Letter from PsyCare, #14 Unredacted Accusose Pharmacy, #15 Unredacted Envelope) (M,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?