USA Parking Systems, LLC v. Eastern Gateway Community College et al
Plaintiff: USA Parking Systems, LLC
Defendant: Eastern Gateway Community College, HEP-EGCC Ohio, LLC and Store Master Funding VI, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01967
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Eastern Gateway Community College. (Alaburda, Justin)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Joseph C. Weinstein and Marissa Black filed by on behalf of Store Master Funding VI, LLC. (Weinstein, Joseph)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Defendant Eastern Gateway Community College's ("EGCC") Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #11 ) shall come on for an electronic hearing to take place via Zoomgov.com on 11/20/2020 at 10:00 a.m. The Zoom Meeting details will be distributed by the Court to counsel. The hearing is limited to 60 minutes in duration. Each side shall be prepared to voice its position in no more than 25 minutes each. Additional time is allowed to respond to the Court's questions. Counsel should not expect to argue beyond their allotted time. Plaintiff USA Parking Systems, LLC shall serve and file a memorandum in opposition to the motion on or before 11/6/2020 at 4:00 p.m. EGCC shall serve and file a reply memorandum, if any, on or before 11/13/2020 at 4:00 p.m. Written stipulations as to all uncontested facts to be presented at the hearing on the motion shall be filed no later than 11/19/2020 at 12:00 p.m. Noon. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/26/2020. (JLG)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Hilary F. DeSaussure. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Affidavit/Declaration of Michael Geoghegan filed by Eastern Gateway Community College. (Duncan, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Affidavit/Declaration of Martha L. Bushey filed by Eastern Gateway Community College. (Duncan, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Defendant Eastern Gateway Community College. (Duncan, Matthew s/ of Justin M. Alaburda)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FILING ERROR - Duplicate of ECF #9 - Attorney Appearance by Matthew R. Duncan filed by on behalf of Eastern Gateway Community College. (Duncan, Matthew) Modified to denote filing error on 10/26/2020 (S,Ke).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Justin M. Alaburda, Mathew R. Duncan, Victoria L. Ferrise, and Hilary F. DeSaussure filed by on behalf of Eastern Gateway Community College. (Alaburda, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to HEP-EGCC Ohio, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 1830 0001 5067 1004. (S,Ke)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon HEP-EGCC Ohio, LLC. (M,R)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for service upon Defendant HEP-EGCC Ohio, LLC filed by USA Parking Systems, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Krzys, Jerry) Modified on 10/1/2020 (M,R).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by USA Parking Systems, LLC. Store Master Funding VI, LLC waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 filed on behalf of USA Parking Systems, LLC (Krzys, Jerry)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Eastern Gateway Community College waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Krzys, Jerry)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in this action was filed on 9/1/2020. The file in this case shows no summons has been provided or issued. If Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Defendants by 10/1/2020, they shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Defendants should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/15/2020. (JLG)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Krzys, Jerry)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,Ke)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,Ke)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10232468. Filed by USA Parking Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2014 Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Management Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2020 Purchase Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Facts, #6 Exhibit 5 - Aug 4, 2020 Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - Sept. 1, 2020 Letter) (Krzys, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA Parking Systems, LLC v. Eastern Gateway Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA Parking Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jerry R. Krzys, II
Represented By: Jerome M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Gateway Community College
Represented By: Hilary F. DeSaussre
Represented By: Victoria L. Serrani
Represented By: Matthew R. Duncan
Represented By: Justin M. Alaburda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEP-EGCC Ohio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Store Master Funding VI, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Weinstein
Represented By: Marissa L. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?