Armstrong v. Mahoning County Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: Richard Armstrong and Richard James Armstrong, Jr.
Defendant: Mahoning County Justice Center and Mahoning County Sheriff
Case Number: 4:2020cv02716
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Copy of Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form #2 mailed to Richard Armstrong Jr. 17927 at Mahoning County Sheriff's Office, 110 Fifth Avenue, Youngstown, OH 44503 on 12/09/2020. (M,MT) (M,MT) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
December 7, 2020 Copy of complaint #1 mailed to Richard Armstrong Jr. 17927 at Mahoning County Sheriff's Office, 110 Fifth Avenue, Youngstown, OH 44503 on 12/07/2020. (M,MT)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to plaintiff for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
December 7, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,MT)
December 7, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,MT)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660127824 Filed by Richard Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons & Return form) (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Mahoning County Justice Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard James Armstrong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoning County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoning County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?