Auciello et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Todd Jarrett and Francine Auciello
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company and Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00615
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Termination of case by clerk on 3/25/2021. See plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). (Doc. No. #6 .) (E,CK)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hulick, Kevin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Andrew Shamis filed by on behalf of Francine Auciello, Todd Jarrett. (Shamis, Andrew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Scott A. Edelsberg filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Edelsberg, Scott)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ju)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Witness List, #2 Appendix B-Exhibit List) (D,Ju)
March 18, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,Ju)
March 18, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (D,Ju)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10725997. Filed by Francine Auciello, Todd Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Auciello Market Valuation Report, #3 Exhibit C - Auciello Settlement Breakdown, #4 Exhibit D - Jarrett Market Valuation Report, #5 Exhibit E - Jarrett Settlement Breakdown, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons to Defendants Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company) (Hulick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auciello et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Jarrett
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Stuart E. Scott
Represented By: Scott A. Edelsberg
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Auciello
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Stuart E. Scott
Represented By: Scott A. Edelsberg
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?