Palumbo v. Lordstown Motors Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Robert Palumbo
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corporation and Stephen S. Burns
Case Number: 4:2021cv00633
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Non-Opposition of movants to competing motion of George Troicky for appointment as lead Plaintiff and selection of lead counsel, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED - Motion for attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821956, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified to note filing error on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED - Motion for attorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821942, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified to note filing error on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Consolidation: There are currently four pending class action securities fraud cases filed against Lordstown Motors Corp. and certain individual defendants. The Court has reviewed the complaints and finds that consolidation is appropriate because the complaints allege similar instances of wrongdoing against the defendants. Consolidation will also preserve judicial resources and promote efficiency in resolving the pending matters. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the four above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Any subsequent case filed before the undersigned or transferred as a related action will be subject to this Order. All filings must be made solely in Case No. 21 CV 616, i.e., the first-filed case, and need only contain the case caption for that case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/21. (LC,S)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion for Admission of Douglas W. Greene Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/6/21. (LC,S)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order: On March 18, 2021, Case No. 4:21 CV 616 was filed. This case was filed shortly thereafter and was identified by the plaintiff as related to the previously filed action. Both are securities fraud cases based on the same or similar conduct. This Court and the transferee Judge accepted this case as a related action. The parties are hereby notified that the Court intends toconsolidate the two cases for pretrial purposes and perhaps trial. The parties are directed to inform the Court within seven days after entry of this Order as to whether any reason exists that would counsel against consolidation. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/30/21. (LC,S)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lordstown Motors Corporation. (Shively, Douglas)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10749578, filed by Stephen S. Burns, Lordstown Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Douglas W. Greene Pro Hac Vice)(Shively, Douglas)
March 29, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lordstown Motors Corporation, Receipt # 7016 3560 0000 3656 3645, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (R,AP)
March 29, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Stephen S. Burns, Receipt # 7016 3560 0000 3656 3652, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (R,AP)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Douglas L. Shively filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.1(b)(3), the above-captioned case is transferred to the docket of Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan, as related to Case No. 4:21CV616. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/24/21. (S,HR)
March 24, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. Judge Christopher A. Boyko terminated. (S,SR)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Stephen S. Burns, Lordstown Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,Ke)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for violations of the Federal Securities Laws with jury demand against Stephen S. Burns, Lordstown Motors Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10730079. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 4:21-cv-00616. Filed by Robert Palumbo. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Summons - Lordstown Motors Corporation, #3 Summons - Stephen Burns, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Simpkins, Scott).
March 19, 2021 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (S,Ke)
March 19, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,Ke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palumbo v. Lordstown Motors Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Palumbo
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corporation
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?