FNY Managed Accounts LLC v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Plaintiff: FNY Managed Accounts LLC
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corp., Stephen S. Burns, Rich Schmidt, Shane Brown, Darren Post and Julio Rodriguez
Petitioner: Globestar Systems Inc. and Daniel Tavares
Case Number: 4:2021cv01021
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR, filed in wrong case. Notice of Non-Opposition of movants to competing motion of George Troicky for appointment as lead Plaintiff and selection of lead counsel, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James) Modified on 6/15/2021, filer notified of error (H,SP).
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting Motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Andrew J. Entwistle for FNY Managed Accounts LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/19/21. (LC,S)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting Motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Robert N. Cappucci for FNY Managed Accounts LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/19/21. (LC,S)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel, filed by Daniel Tavares, Globestar Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support, #3 Rosenthal Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 - Movants' PSLRA Certifications, #6 Exhibit 3 - Movants' Loss Chart, #7 Exhibit 4 - RLF Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit 5 - CRK Firm Resume)(Rosenthal, James) Modified text on 5/20/2021 (S,AN).
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Robert N. Cappucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10837079, filed by Plaintiff FNY Managed Accounts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wayne, Richard)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Andrew J. Entwistle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10837056, filed by Plaintiff FNY Managed Accounts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wayne, Richard)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan for all further proceedings as a case related to Case No. 4:21CV0616. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/17/2021. (JLG)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (D,Ju)
May 17, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)
May 17, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
May 17, 2021 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (D,Ju)
May 17, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. (D,Ju)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Shane Brown, Stephen S. Burns, Lordstown Motors Corp., Darren Post, Julio Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10835067. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 4:21-cv-616. Filed by FNY Managed Accounts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certification for FNY Managed Account LLC) (Wayne, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FNY Managed Accounts LLC v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FNY Managed Accounts LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Wayne
Represented By: William K. Flynn
Represented By: Robert N. Cappucci
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Globestar Systems Inc.
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Tavares
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?