Stanislaw v. City of Warren, Ohio
Plaintiff: Megan Stanislaw
Defendant: City of Warren, Ohio
Case Number: 4:2021cv01029
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by All Defendants. (Pinzone, John)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 7/26/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by City of Warren, Ohio. (Pinzone, John)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,Ju)
May 18, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
May 18, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Trumbull County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number 2021 CV 00377 with Jury Demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10837448. Filed by City of Warren, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons City of Warren, #3 Civil Cover Sheet (Pinzone, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanislaw v. City of Warren, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Stanislaw
Represented By: F. Benjamin Riek, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Warren, Ohio
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?