Kalna v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Kalna and Michael D. Kalna
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01323
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 9/20/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Coverage))(Lloyd, Katheryn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,Ju)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Merl, Amber)
July 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,Ju)
July 9, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Merl, Amber)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021 CV 00938 Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10922587. Filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Defendants Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B-State Court filings (Merl, Amber) Modified docket text on 7/9/2021 (D,Ju). Modified docket text description on 7/19/2021 (D,Ju).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalna v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kalna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Kalna
Represented By: David S. Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber L. Merl
Represented By: Katheryn M. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?