Nommay v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Nommay
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Sagewell Healthcare Benefits Trust
Case Number: 4:2021cv01390
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulation & Order to Dismiss Defendant Sagewell Healthcare Benefits Trust ONLY Without Prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/10/2021. (O,K)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Sagewell Healthcare Benefits Trust ONLY Without Prejudice filed by Charlotte Nommay. (McDonald, Joseph)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Charlotte Nommay. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021 filed on behalf of Charlotte Nommay (McDonald, Joseph)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (D,Ju)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 07/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Witness List, #2 Appendix B-Exhibit List) (D,Ju)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Life Insurance Company of North America, Sagewell Healthcare Benefits Trust. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10941603.. Filed by Charlotte Nommay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 5, 2021 letter to Cigna, #2 Exhibit B - May 11, 2021 letter to Cigna, #3 Exhibit C - May 18, 2021 letter to Cigna Law Department, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (McDonald, Joseph)
July 20, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (D,Ju)
July 20, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nommay v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Nommay
Represented By: Joseph P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel W. Srsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagewell Healthcare Benefits Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?