Mott v. U.S.D.A. et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Mott and Terrence Mott
Defendant: U.S.D.A., U.S. Army Corp of Engineers, U.S. Navy, Dominion East Ohio Gas, Cleveland Cliffs, Coke Works Warren, Ohio, Diversified Gas & Oil, Eric Petroleum Corporation, Eastern Everflow, Warren Waste Water, Twinsburg Waste Water, Alliance Waste Water, East Canton Waste Incineration, East Ohio Gas Company, City of Alliance, Plumbers and Steamfitters, UAW, CDC and USW
Case Number: 4:2021cv01464
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendant The East Ohio Gas Company d/b/a Dominion Energy Ohio's (incorrectly identified as "Dominion East Ohio Gas" and hereinafter referred to as "Dominion Energy") Motion for Leave to Move or Plead (ECF No. #10 ) is granted. Because Plaintiff has until 10/26/2021 to serve the summons and complaint upon the defendants, see Order (ECFNo. #7 ), Dominion Energy is granted leave until 10/29/2021 to answer, plead or otherwise move to the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/8/2021. (JLG)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc. for East Ohio Gas Company filed by East Ohio Gas Company. (Rechner, Matthew)
September 8, 2021 Copy of #12 Order mailed to Plaintiff Terrence Mott, 3241 Estates Cir., Youngstown, Ohio 44511 on 9/8/2021. Related document(s) #12 . (JLG)
September 8, 2021 Notice by Clerk that East Ohio Gas Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for leave to Move or Plead until September 30,2021 filed by Defendant East Ohio Gas Company. (Mancuso, Sarah) Modified on 9/8/2021 (S,SR).
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant USW. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Mott's Complaint in 4:17 cv 1086, #3 Exhibit B (Judge Boyko's Dismissal Order in 4:17 cv 186, #4 Exhibit C (Mott's Amended Complaint in 4:17 cv 2495, #5 Exhibit D (Judge Pearson's Dismissal Order in 4: 17 cv 2495)(Gallagher, Timothy)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Warren Waste Water. (Wheeler, Alyssa)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Pro Se Plaintiff Terrence Mott is a resident of Youngstown, Ohio. On 7/28/2021, Mott filed a Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) against 17 defendants and has paid the filing fee. This matter is still pending before the Court to conduct the screening required by 28 U.S.C. 1915. Pending is Defendant U.A.W.'s Motion for Leave to Move or Plead (ECF No. #5 ). The motion does not state whether U.A.W. has been served with process. The motion, however, is granted. Defendant U.A.W. is granted leave until 10/29/2021 to answer, plead or otherwise move to the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ). On 8/10/2021, the original summons were issued to Plaintiff for service upon Defendants Alliance Waste Water, CDC, Cleveland Cliffs, Diversified Gas & Oil, Dominion East Ohio Gas, Eastern Everflow, Eric Petroleum Corporation, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Twinsburg Waste Water, U.S. Army Corp of Engineers, U.S. Navy, U.S.D.A., U.A.W., USWA, and Warren Waste Water. See ECF No. #3 . When a pro se plaintiff pays the full filing fee, as is the case here, the plaintiff is responsible for perfecting service upon the defendants. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) requires the plaintiff to serve the summons and complaint upon the defendants within 90 days after the complaint is filed. There is no indication on the docket that Plaintiff has perfected service of the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) upon Defendants, including U.A.W., as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff cannot show good cause why service of the summons and complaint was not made within 90 days after the filing of the complaint, pursuant to Rule 4(m), the action will be dismissed without prejudice on 10/27/2021. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/2/2021. (JLG)
September 2, 2021 Copy of #7 Order mailed to Plaintiff Terrence Mott, 3241 Estates Cir., Youngstown, OH 44511 on 9/2/2021. Related document(s) #7 . (JLG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant City of Alliance. (Boyer, Kallen)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until 10/29/2021 to answer Complaint or Move Pursuant to Rule 12(b) filed by Defendant UAW. (Geisinger, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey J. Geisinger filed by on behalf of UAW. (Geisinger, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons issued for service upon Alliance Waste Water, CDC, Cleveland Cliffs, Diversified Gas & Oil, Dominion East Ohio Gas, Eastern Everflow, Eric Petroleum Corporation, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Twinsburg Waste Water, U.S. Army Corp of Engineers, U.S. Navy, U.S.D.A., UAW, USWA, Warren Waste Water. (D,Ju)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. Mailed to Plaintiff via regular mail. (D,Ju)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt # 44660005856. Filed by Terrance Mott. File stamped copy given to Plaintiff at intake window (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (D,Ju)
July 28, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
July 28, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,Ju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott v. U.S.D.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.D.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corp of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion East Ohio Gas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Cliffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coke Works Warren, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Gas & Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Everflow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Waste Water
Represented By: Alyssa J. Wheeler
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Represented By: James A. Climer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twinsburg Waste Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Waste Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Canton Waste Incineration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Ohio Gas Company
Represented By: Matthew R. Rechner
Represented By: Sarah M. Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alliance
Represented By: Kallen L. Boyer
Represented By: R. Eric Smearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumbers and Steamfitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAW
Represented By: Dennis Haines
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Geisinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USW
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?