B&T Express Inc. v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: B&T Express Inc.
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company doing business as CNA Insurance Co., Acrisure, LLC doing business as Frates Irwin Risk Management Solutions, Wellco Tank Trucks Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv01744
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 16 Motion for extension of time until December 15, 2021 to file response/reply to #13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , #11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff B&T Express Inc.. Related document(s) #13 , #11 . (Saks, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 Replymemorandum in support of #4 Motion to remand pursuant to State Court filed by B&T Express Inc.. (Saks, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/25/2021 (D,Th).
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Stipulation filed by B&T Express Inc.. (Saks, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Acrisure, LLC. (Maluchnik, Crystal)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition to #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Acrisure, LLC. (Maluchnik, Crystal)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certified Policy, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Insurance)(Kaufman, Arthur)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Marshall D. Buck filed by on behalf of Wellco Tank Trucks Inc.. (Buck, Marshall)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for Continental Casualty Company filed by Continental Casualty Company. (Kaufman, Arthur)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Defendant Continental Casualty Company's Motion for Leave to Plead (ECF No. #5 ) and Defendant Acrisure, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #6 ) are granted in part. Defendants now have until 10/14/2021 to provide any response to the Complaint, and any response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Any reply shall be made not later than 14 days after the response. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/16/2021. (JLG)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by B&T Express Inc.. (Saks, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of 14 days until 9/29/2021 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Acrisure, LLC. (Maluchnik, Crystal)
September 15, 2021 Notice by Clerk that Continental Casualty Company and B&T Express Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion for leave to Plead for an additional 30 days until October 15, 2021 filed by Defendant Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Arthur) Modified event on 9/15/2021 (S,SR).
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff B&T Express Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - bill of lading and invoice)(Saks, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (G,M)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Acrisure, LLC dba Frates Irwin Risk Management Solutions. (Janik, Steven)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Mahoning County, Ohio, case number 2021 CV 01365 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11023084. Filed by Acrisure, LLC dba Frates Irwin Risk Management Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Filings from the Court of Common Pleas, Mahoning County, Ohio; Case No: 2021 CV 01365, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Janik, Steven)
September 8, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (G,M)
September 8, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (G,M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&T Express Inc. v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&T Express Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Saks
Represented By: Michael B. Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company doing business as CNA Insurance Co.
Represented By: Arthur M. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acrisure, LLC doing business as Frates Irwin Risk Management Solutions
Represented By: Crystal L. Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellco Tank Trucks Inc.
Represented By: Marshall D. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?