Hairston v. Jones
Plaintiff: Rico Hairston
Defendant: J. Jones
Case Number: 4:2021cv01971
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Second Notice to the Court of a Substantial Risk of Serious Harm to Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Rico Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Summary of Incidents, #2 Exhibit B - Informal Complaint Resolution, #3 envelope)(R,Li)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Address Change Notice filed by Rico Hairston. (D,Th)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Court of Plaintiff's 3 Strike Status and Request to be Allowed to Proceed IFP Due to Risk of Imminent Danger and Serious Physical Injury filed by Rico Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Disposition of Grievance dated 7/30/2021, #2 Exhibit B- Disposition of Grievance dated 7/30/2021, #3 Exhibit C- Notification of Grievance dated 10/1/2021, #4 Exhibit D- Notification of Grievance dated 8/3/2021, #5 envelope)Related document(s) #1 , #2 .(G,M)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint filed by Rico Hairston. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 envelope)(G,M)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Rico Hairston. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 OSP-Inmate Demand Statement)(D,Ju)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against J. Jones. Filing fee not paid, IFP.. Filed by Rico Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285, #3 envelope) (D,Ju)
October 19, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Copy of the #1 Complaint, and a blank Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Rico Hairston, 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Road, Youngstown, Ohio 44505. (D,Ju)
October 19, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
October 19, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairston v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?