Johnson v. Warden
Petitioner: Terence J. Johnson
Respondent: Warden and Warden Warden
Case Number: 4:2021cv02128
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Judgment Entry that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 12/2/21. (K,C)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Opinion and Order that Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 is denied and dismissed without prejudice. The Court finds,pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 12/2/21. (K,C)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petitioner's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #4 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/2/21.(K,C)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of #5 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #7 Judgment, and #6 Memorandum Opinion and Order, mailed to Terence J. Johnson at FCI Elkton on 12/6/21. Related document(s) #5 , #7 , #6 . (K,C)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Terence J. Johnson. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (R,AP)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) and blank IFP form mailed to Terence J. Johnson #55140-039 at FCI ELKTON P.O. Box 10 Lisbon, OH 44432 on 11/10/2021. Related document(s) #1 . (H,JL)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern. Case number 1:21-cv-12517. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 11/9/2021 (H,JL).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,JL)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (H,JL)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (LHos) [Transferred from mied on 11/9/2021.]
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Order Transferring Case Outside the State of Michigan on Terence J. Johnson #55140-039, FCI ELKTON, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH 444132. (KWin) [Transferred from mied on 11/9/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terence J. Johnson against Warden. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra) [Transferred from mied on 11/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terence J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?