Evans v. City of Newton Falls, Ohio, et al.
Plaintiff: Matthew Evans
Defendant: City of Newton Falls, Ohio and Pamela S. Priddy
Case Number: 4:2021cv02421
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures filed by City of Newton Falls, Ohio, Pamela S. Priddy. (Immel, Kristopher)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Matthew Evans. (Rossi, Michael)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by Matthew Evans. (Rossi, Michael)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (E,CK)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 3/4/2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 2/14/2022. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 2/21/2022. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (E,CK)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by City of Newton Falls, Ohio, Pamela S. Priddy. (Immel, Kristopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (G,M)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (G,M)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by City of Newton Falls, Ohio and Pamela S. Priddy. Related document(s) #1 .(Immel, Kristopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Trumbull County Common Pleas Court, case number 2021CV01398 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11199372. Filed by Pamela S. Priddy, City of Newton Falls, Ohio. (Immel, Kristopher, s/ by Alfred Schrader)
December 29, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (G,M)
December 29, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (G,M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. City of Newton Falls, Ohio, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Evans
Represented By: Michael D. Rossi, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newton Falls, Ohio
Represented By: Alfred E. Schrader
Represented By: Kristopher B. Immel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela S. Priddy
Represented By: Alfred E. Schrader
Represented By: Kristopher B. Immel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?