Stanton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael W. Stanton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2022cv00102
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Amanda M Knapp
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #1 . (Ina, Rema)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: The transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1 and this Order. Compliance with all requirements set forth in this Order is expected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 1/19/2022. (S,S)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan 01/19/2022. (D,Ju)
January 19, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp pursuant to Local Rule 72.2.. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 01/19/2022. (D,Ju)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 1/19/2022. (S,S)
January 19, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (D,Ju)
January 19, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (D,Ju)
January 19, 2022 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (D,Ju)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 Status Report filed by Michael W. Stanton. (Olinsky, Howard)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael W. Stanton. (Olinsky, Howard)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michael W. Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 USM-285 Form, #8 USM-285 Form, #9 USM-285 Form) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Stanton
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Rema Alberta Ina
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?