Simon et al v. DeWine et al
Plaintiff: Reverend Kenneth L. Simon, Lewis Macklin, Helen Youngblood and Reverand Lewis W. Macklin, II
Defendant: Mike DeWine, Secretary of State Frank LaRose, Ohio Redistricting Commission, Robert R. Cupp, Matt Huffman, Keith Faber and Frank LaRose
Case Number: 4:2022cv00612
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 23 Reply in support of #15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Defendants. (Pfeiffer, Julie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 22 Marginal Entry Order denying as moot #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to oppose the motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs' opposition was timely filed before the 30-day response time for dispositive motions. Judge John R. Adams on 5/31/2022.(L,J)
May 24, 2022 Filing 21 Response to #18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Squire, Percy)
May 20, 2022 Filing 20 Opposition to #15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Appointment of a Special Master, #18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Squire, Percy)
May 17, 2022 Filing 19 Motion for extension of time until May 20, 2022 to file response/reply to #15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Appointment of a Special Master filed by Lewis W. Macklin, II, Kenneth L. Simon, Helen Youngblood. Related document(s) #15 . (Squire, Percy)
May 11, 2022 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Three-Judge Court, Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Partial Summary Judgment, and Immediate Appointment of a Special Master filed by Defendant Ohio Redistricting Commission. Related documents #1 , #2 , #3 & #4 . (Clark, Erik) Modified text on 5/16/2022 (M,TL).
May 11, 2022 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Ashley T. Merino filed by on behalf of Ohio Redistricting Commission. (Merino, Ashley)
May 11, 2022 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Erik J. Clark filed by on behalf of Ohio Redistricting Commission. (Clark, Erik)
May 4, 2022 Filing 15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Appointment of a Special Master filed by Robert R. Cupp, Mike DeWine, Keith Faber, Matt Huffman, Frank LaRose. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Congressional Plan, 3/2/2022, #2 Exhibit B, Directive 2022-27)(Pfeiffer, Julie)
May 4, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Three Judge Court filed by Robert R. Cupp, Mike DeWine, Keith Faber, Matt Huffman, Frank LaRose. (Pfeiffer, Julie)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service by process server executed upon Mike DeWine on 4-20-22, Frank LaRose on 4-20-22, Ohio Redistricting Commission on 4-20-22, Robert R. Cupp on 4-20-22, Matt Huffman on 4-20-22 and Keith Faber on 4-20-22, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cupp Return, #2 Supplement Faber Return, #3 Supplement Huffman Return, #4 Supplement LaRose Return, #5 Supplement ORC Return)(Squire, Percy) Modified text on 4/27/2022 (M,TL).
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Garrett M. Anderson filed by on behalf of Robert R. Cupp, Matt Huffman. (Anderson, Garrett)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Allison D. Daniel filed by on behalf of Robert R. Cupp, Matt Huffman. (Daniel, Allison)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Julie M. Pfeiffer filed by on behalf of Robert R. Cupp, Matt Huffman. (Pfeiffer, Julie)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Garrett M. Anderson filed by on behalf of Mike DeWine, Keith Faber, Frank LaRose. (Anderson, Garrett)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Allison D. Daniel filed by on behalf of Mike DeWine, Keith Faber, Frank LaRose. (Daniel, Allison)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Julie M. Pfeiffer filed by on behalf of Mike DeWine, Keith Faber, Frank LaRose. (Pfeiffer, Julie)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of Transfer of a Previously Filed Case This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge John R. Adams for all further proceedings. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/19/2022. (JLG)
April 19, 2022 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. (D,Ju)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Robert R. Cupp, Mike DeWine, Keith Faber, Matt Huffman, Frank LaRose, Ohio Redistricting Commission. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ju)
April 18, 2022 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
April 18, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (D,Ju)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for temporary restraining order Preliminary Injunction And Partial Summary Judgment, And Immediate Appointment Of A Special Master filed by Lewis Macklin, Kenneth L. Simon, Helen Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-March 2 Plan, #2 Exhibit B-Armour Opinion, #3 Exhibit C-DiRossi Trans, #4 Exhibit D-LLT, #5 Exhibit E-Proposed Plan, #6 Exhibit F-9/15 Trans., #7 Proposed Order, #8 Supplement Notice, #9 Supplement Bond)(Squire, Percy)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 Motion for class certification filed by Lewis Macklin, Kenneth L. Simon, Helen Youngblood. (Squire, Percy)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for a Three Judge Court filed by Lewis Macklin, Kenneth L. Simon, Helen Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Squire, Percy)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11375206. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 2:21-cv-2267. Filed by Helen Youngblood, Lewis Macklin, Kenneth L. Simon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- 8/23/21 Hearing, #3 Exhibit B- march 2 Plan, #4 Exhibit C -DiRossi Transcript, #5 Exhibit D -Proposed District, #6 Summons Cupp, #7 Summons DeWine, #8 Summons Faber, #9 Summons Huffman, #10 Summons LaRose, #11 Summons ORC) (Squire, Percy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon et al v. DeWine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverend Kenneth L. Simon
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Macklin
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Youngblood
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverand Lewis W. Macklin, II
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: Allison D. Daniel
Represented By: Garrett M. Anderson
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Frank LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Redistricting Commission
Represented By: Ashley T. Merino
Represented By: Erik J. Clark
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Cupp
Represented By: Allison D. Daniel
Represented By: Garrett M. Anderson
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Huffman
Represented By: Allison D. Daniel
Represented By: Garrett M. Anderson
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Faber
Represented By: Allison D. Daniel
Represented By: Garrett M. Anderson
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank LaRose
Represented By: Allison D. Daniel
Represented By: Garrett M. Anderson
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?