Full Line Real Estate and Construction, LLC v. Poindexter EL
Plaintiff: Full Line Real Estate and Construction, LLC
Defendant: Rhonda Yvette Poindexter EL and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2023cv00936
Filed: May 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 Returned Mail addressed to Party Rhonda Yvette Poindecter, EL. Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as addressed, Unable to Forward. Related document(s) #3 . (D,Th)
June 5, 2023 Filing 5 Acknowledgement of receipt of Order of Remand received from Youngstown Municipal Court. Related document(s) #4 . (D,Th)
May 25, 2023 Filing 4 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Youngstown Municipal Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (G,M)
May 25, 2023 Copy of #3 Order of Remand mailed to Rhonda Yvette Poindexter at: 5500 Market Street Suite 120 Box #128 Youngstown, OH 44512 and 739 Pineview Ave. Youngstown, OH 44511 on 5/25/2023. (G,M)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Remand For the reasons set forth herein, this action is hereby remanded to Youngstown Municipal Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Court further certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/24/2023. (JLG)
May 8, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Defendant Rhonda Yvette Poindexter EL. Related document(s) #1 . (D,Ju)
May 8, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Youngstown Municipal Court, case number 23CVG01127Y Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Rhonda Yvette Poindexter EL. (Attachments: #1 Court documents from Youngstown Municipal Court, Case No. 23CVG01127Y, #2 civil cover sheet) (D,Ju)
May 8, 2023 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
May 8, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)
May 8, 2023 Copy of #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Rhonda Yvette Poindexter EL at 739 Pineview Avenue, Youngstown, Ohio 44511 on 05/08/2023. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (D,Ju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Full Line Real Estate and Construction, LLC v. Poindexter EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Yvette Poindexter EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Full Line Real Estate and Construction, LLC
Represented By: Katherine E. Rudzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?